EP3408223 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OXYGEN PRODUCTION AND ENERGY STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infratech Industries PTY Ltd Unit 1 17 Burwood Road Burwood, New South Wales 2134 / AU | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOGHTADERI, Behdad c/o The University of Newcastle Research Associates Ltd Industry Development Centre University Drive Callaghan New South Wales 2308 / AU | 02 /
SHAH, Kalpit c/o Newcastle Innovation Limited Industry Development Centre University Drive Callaghan New South Wales 2308 / AU | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Stratagem IPM Limited Meridian Court Comberton Road Toft, Cambridge CB23 2RY / GB | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 17743488.3 | 24.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017AU50054 | Priority number, date | AU20160900222 | 25.01.2016 Original published format: AU 2016900222 | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017127886 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3408223 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/08, B01J8/24, F23L7/00, F23C99/00 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
C01B13/08 (EP,US);
B01D53/265 (US);
C01B13/0248 (US);
F23C10/01 (US);
F23C99/00 (EP,US);
F23L7/00 (EP,US);
F23L7/007 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0009 (US);
F23C2202/00 (US);
F23C2900/99008 (EP,US);
F23L2900/07001 (EP,US);
Y02E20/32 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/49] | C01B13/08, B01J8/24, F23L7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SAUERSTOFFERZEUGUNG UND ENERGIESPEICHERUNG | [2018/49] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OXYGEN PRODUCTION AND ENERGY STORAGE | [2018/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'OXYGÈNE ET DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2018/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3892682 (PUNWANI DHARAMVIR, et al) [X] 1-23* Abstract; Col 1, lines 55-61; Col 7, line 7- Col 11, line 55 *; | [X]WO2012164371 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-13, 15-23 * claims 1-15; Fig 1-3 *; | [X]WO2013040645 (NEWCASTLE INNOVATION LTD [AU]) [X] 1-13, 15-23 * Fig. 11 to Fig.14 *; | [X] - SHAH, K. et al., "Integration options for novel chemical looping air separation (ICLAS) process for oxygen production in oxy-fuel coal fired power plants", Fuel, vol. 107, (20130129), pages 356 - 370, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2013.01.007, XP029003287 [X] 1-13, 15-23 * . Abstract; Page 360, Fig 3 and 4; Page 385, Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2013.01.007 |