EP3410389 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/03] |
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Tong c/o Ants Patent Team 17F Building B, Huanglong Times Plaza No. 18 Wantang Road Hangzhou 310099 / CN | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17743592.2 | 16.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017CN71256 | Priority number, date | CN20161049672 | 25.01.2016 Original published format: CN201610049672 | [2018/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017128977 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410389 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, G06K9/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
G06F18/253 (EP,US);
G06T3/40 (EP,KR,US);
G06T3/4038 (CN);
G06F17/16 (US);
G06F18/23 (US);
G06T5/50 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/49] | G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2018/49] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2018/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2018/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2018 | Translation filed | 24.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 12.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 16.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - GOSHTASBY ET AL, "Fusion of multi-exposure images", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 23, no. 6, ISSN 0262-8856, (20050601), pages 611 - 618, (20050601), XP027617890 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 612, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 2 * | International search | [A]US2010092075 (LEE SHIH-JONG J [US], et al) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [X]CN102436589 (CHINESE ACAD INST ELECTRONICS) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0218]-[0247] *; | [A]CN103839275 (INST REMOTE SENSING & DIGITAL EARTH CAS) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document * |