EP3410468 - N-TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, COMPLEMENTARY TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE IN WHICH THE SAME IS USED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/49] | n-TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, COMPLEMENTARY TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE IN WHICH SAME IS USED | ||
[2024/14] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Hiroji c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
MURASE, Seiichiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
SAKII, Daisuke c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 17744066.6 | 19.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017JP01777 | Priority number, date | JP20160011239 | 25.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016011239 | JP20160011240 | 25.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016011240 | JP20160239049 | 09.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016239049 | [2018/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017130836 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410468 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3410468 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H10K85/20, H10K10/46, H10K85/60, // H04B5/77 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H10K85/221 (EP,US);
H10K10/462 (KR);
H10K10/471 (EP,US);
C07C211/02 (KR);
C07C251/04 (KR);
H01L21/8238 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/092 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/786 (EP,US);
H10K10/00 (US);
H10K10/488 (EP,US);
H10K19/10 (US);
H10K71/12 (US);
H10K85/113 (US);
H10K85/225 (EP);
H10K85/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/12] | H10K85/20, H10K10/46, H10K85/60, // H01L27/092, H01L29/786, H01L21/8238 | ||
Former IPC [2019/51] | H01L51/30, H01L27/092, H01L29/786 | ||
Former IPC [2018/49] | H01L21/336, H01L21/8238, H01L27/092, H01L29/786, H01L51/05, H01L51/30, H01L51/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, KOMPLEMENTÄRES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN | [2024/12] | English: | N-TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, COMPLEMENTARY TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE IN WHICH THE SAME IS USED | [2024/14] | French: | ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE TYPE n, DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE TYPE COMPLÉMENTAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL L'UTILISANT | [2018/49] |
Former [2018/49] | N-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, KOMPLEMENTÄRES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2018/49] | n-TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, COMPLEMENTARY TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE IN WHICH SAME IS USED | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2018 | Translation filed | 10.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 08.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2024 | 12.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2287936 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [Y]US2011079770 (CHO GYOU-JIN [KR], et al); | [Y]EP2975649 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | International search | [Y]WO2005057665 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XYA]WO2009139339 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [X]JP2009283924 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XYA]WO2014142105 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | Examination | EP1617484 | by applicant | US2003122133 | JP2008311594 | WO2009139339 | JP2014116564 |