EP3490448 - AUTOMATIC THRESHOLDS FOR ATRIAL TACHYARRHYTHMIA DETECTION IN AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Jian 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Mark L. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 03 /
HIGGINS, Elise J. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 04 /
DEGROOT, Paul J. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis Minnesota 55432 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17746350.2 | 25.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US43627 | Priority number, date | US201662367177P | 27.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662367177 P | US201715588810 | 08.05.2017 Original published format: US201715588810 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022558 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490448 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/283, A61B5/316, A61B5/366, G16H40/63, G16H50/30, A61B5/024, G16H40/67, A61B5/363, A61B5/352, A61B5/0245, A61B5/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A61B5/363 (EP,US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/02405 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (EP,US);
A61B5/333 (US);
A61B5/339 (US);
A61B5/352 (EP,US);
A61B5/366 (EP,US);
A61B5/4836 (EP,US);
A61B5/686 (US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,US);
A61N1/3624 (US);
A61N1/36507 (US);
A61N1/3925 (US);
A61N1/3956 (US);
A61N1/3987 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
A61B2505/07 (EP,US);
A61B5/0245 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | A61B5/0456, A61B5/0472, A61B5/0464, A61B5/00, A61B5/04, A61B5/024, A61B5/0245, A61B5/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE SCHWELLEN FÜR DIE ATRIALE TACHYARRHYTHMIE-ERKENNUNG IN EINER IMPLANTIERBAREN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2019/23] | English: | AUTOMATIC THRESHOLDS FOR ATRIAL TACHYARRHYTHMIA DETECTION IN AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE | [2019/23] | French: | SEUILS AUTOMATIQUES POUR LA DÉTECTION DE TACHYARYTHMIE AURICULAIRE DANS UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 05.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2024 | 15.05.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9743002 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 41, lines 9, 11 * * page 42, line 12 - line 25 * * page 43, lines 22, 23, 26, 27 * * page 44, lines 10, 11, 22, 23 * * figures 11, 12 * [I] 11-14; | [A]US2006036288 (BOCEK JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US7120491 (BAILIN STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2010317984 (MCCARTHY JASON [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 46] , [0 72] , [0 76] , [0 77] , [0 78] , [0 80] * * table 1 * * figure 5 * [I] 11-14; | [A]US2011130666 (DONG YANTING [US], et al) [A] 11-14 * paragraphs [0072] , [0 89] *; | [A]US2011270096 (OSORIO IVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US4374382 | US5117824 | US5193535 | US5545186 | US6067473 | US6412490 | US6418346 | US6442433 | US6480745 | US6599250 | US7027858 | US7031765 | US7333855 | US7537569 | US7623911 | US7627368 | US7831304 | US8639316 | US8923963 | US8977350 | US2015088216 |