EP3413221 - RISK ASSESSMENT METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhougyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jiang 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-Tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17746812.1 | 20.01.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017CN71920 | Priority number, date | CN20161070616 | 01.02.2016 Original published format: CN201610070616 | [2018/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017133492 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413221 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/02 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G06Q40/03 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F17/18 (KR);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06Q10/0635 (KR);
G16Z99/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | G06F19/00, G06Q40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Title | German: | RISIKOBEWERTUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2018/50] | English: | RISK ASSESSMENT METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2018/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ÉVALUATION DE RISQUE | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2018 | Translation filed | 03.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 03.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014143134 (YAN RUI [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0013] ** paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0156] * | International search | [A]US2004249678 (HENDERSON E DEVERE [US]) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO2011057217 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-13* , the whole document *; | [A]CN102117469 (IND & COMMERCIAL BANK CHINA) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN105243474 (ZHEJIANG SECURITY PRODUCTION SCIENCE RES INST) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document * |