EP3412338 - DEVICE WITH HIGH ENERGY ROTATING MAGNET AND MASSAGE CHAIR STRUCTURE WITH ROTATING MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heye Health Technology Co., Ltd. Bamboo Industry Science and Technology Entrepreneurship Center Buildings 6/7/8/9/10 Xiaofeng Town, Anji County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province 313300 / CN | [2020/51] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Zhejiang Heye Health Technology Co., Ltd. Health Medical Industry Park Economic Development Zone Anji County Huzhou, Hejiang 313000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Zhicai Zhejiang Heye Health Technology Co., Ltd. Sunshine Industrial 2nd Park Anji County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province 313000 / CN | 02 /
HU, Lijiang Health Medical Industry Park Economic Development Zone Anji County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province 313000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Jun Zhejiang Heye Health Technology Co., Ltd. Sunshine Industrial 2nd Park Anji County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province 313000 / CN | [2020/51] |
Former [2019/01] | 01 /
FANG, Zhicai Zhejiang Heye Health Technology Co., Ltd. Sunshine Industrial 2nd Park Anji County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province 313000 / CN | ||
02 /
HU, Lijiang Health Medical Industry Park Economic Development Zone Anji County Huzhou Zhejiang 313000 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Jun Zhejiang Heye Health Technology Co., Ltd. Sunshine Industrial 2nd Park Anji County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province 313000 / CN | |||
Former [2018/50] | 01 /
FANG, Zhicai Health Medical Industry Park Economic Development Zone Anji County Huzhou Zhejiang 313000 / CN | ||
02 /
HU, Lijiang Health Medical Industry Park Economic Development Zone Anji County Huzhou Zhejiang 313000 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Jun Health Medical Industry Park Economic Development Zone Anji County Huzhou Zhejiang 313000 / CN | Representative(s) | Grzelak, Anna Sigeon IP, sp z o. o. ul. Raclawicka 146 p. II 02-117 Warszawa / PL | [2020/51] |
Former [2018/50] | Grzelak, Anna WTS Patent Attorneys Witek, Sniezko & Partners ul. Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | Application number, filing date | 17746934.3 | 25.01.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017CN72579 | Priority number, date | CN20161075463 | 03.02.2016 Original published format: CN201610075463 | [2018/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017133614 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3412338 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3412338 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61N2/12, A61H23/02 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A61N2/12 (EP,CN,US);
A47C7/506 (CN);
A47C7/62 (CN);
A61H23/0254 (US);
A61H2201/0149 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | A61N2/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT HOCHENERGETISCHEM ROTIERENDEM MAGNET UND MASSAGESTUHLSTRUKTUR MIT ROTIERENDEM MAGNET | [2018/50] | English: | DEVICE WITH HIGH ENERGY ROTATING MAGNET AND MASSAGE CHAIR STRUCTURE WITH ROTATING MAGNET | [2018/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF À AIMANT ROTATIF À HAUTE ÉNERGIE ET STRUCTURE DE CHAISE DE MASSAGE À AIMANT ROTATIF | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2018 | Translation filed | 03.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 06.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2017 | AL | 16.12.2020 | AT | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | DK | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | ES | 16.12.2020 | FI | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | IT | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | NL | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | RS | 16.12.2020 | SE | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | SM | 16.12.2020 | IE | 25.01.2021 | LU | 25.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | FR | 16.02.2021 | BG | 16.03.2021 | GB | 16.03.2021 | NO | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GB | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.01.2021 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
FR | 16.02.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2021 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]CN2778259Y (ZHANG QINGQUAN [CN]) [X] 1-10 * , description, page 7, line 5 to page 10, line 5 and page 13, lines 1-19, and figures 1-7 *; | [X]CN1788810 (TIAN ZHONGSHU [CN]) [X] 1-10 * , description, page 1, line 16 to page 5, line 1, and figure 2 *; | [A]CN2933383Y (ANJI QIANGLONG STEEL & PLASTIC [CN]) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [A]CN202161527U (XIAMEN COMFORT SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN203090265U (HE PENGFEI) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103892986 (HANGZHOU SHOUKEN APPLIANCE CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN105536149 (ZHEJIANG HEYE HEALTH TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 *; | [PX]CN105553175 (ZHEJIANG HEYE HEALTH TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-9 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0028], and figures 1-6 *; | [PX]CN105726257 (ZHEJIANG HEYE HEALTH TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *; | [PX]CN205566001U (ZHEJIANG HEYE HEALTH TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-9 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0033], and figures 1-6 *; | [PX]CN205548928U (ZHEJIANG HEYE HEALTH TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 *; | [PX]CN205612878U (ZHEJIANG HEYE HEALTH TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0003]-[0036], and figures 1-6 * | Examination | JPS56156164 |