EP3410944 - BIOPSY INCISION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dermazip AB Rösundavägen 4 133 36 Saltsjöbaden / SE | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANDQUIST, Charles Boo Strandväg 53 132 36 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | 02 /
FALK, Henrik Kommendörsgatan 8 F 114 48 Stockholm / SE | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2018/50] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 17747877.3 | 02.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017SE50092 | Priority number, date | SE20160050125 | 02.02.2016 Original published format: SE 1650125 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017135879 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410944 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3410944 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02, // A61B17/3205, A61B17/3209, A61B17/32, A61B17/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61B10/0266 (EP,US);
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61B17/3205 (EP,US);
A61B17/32093 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00761 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | A61B10/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR BIOPSIESCHNITTE | [2018/50] | English: | BIOPSY INCISION DEVICE | [2018/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INCISION DE BIOPSIE | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 24.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 08.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2073591 (WELSH NAT SCHOOL MED) [X] 1,2,5 * page 1, line 54 - line 100; figures 1-3 * [I] 6-8,10,15; | [XI]US2007232954 (HARRIS JEFFREY P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-9 *[I] 5-7,9,10,15; | [XI]US2009018467 (CHIU KWOK WAI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,11,12 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * [I] 9,10,15; | [XI]US2014073987 (KANG SEWON [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,11-14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-9 * [I] 6,7,9,10,15 | International search | [X]US2007232954 (HARRIS JEFFREY P [US], et al) [X] 1-19* , paragraphs [0019]-[0022] *; | [X]US2009018467 (CHIU KWOK WAI [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0044]-[0046]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2014073987 (KANG SEWON [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * , whole document * | Examination | US2007142853 | by applicant | GB2073591 | US2007232954 | US2009018467 | US7591835 | US2014073987 |