EP3414929 - AUTHENTICATING OR REGISTERING USERS OF WEARABLE DEVICES USING BIOMETRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mefon Ventures Inc. 805 - 6555 Bonsor Avenue Burnaby, BC V5H 3E9 / CA | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Shan 805 - 6555 Bonsor Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V5H 3E9 / CA | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Dargiewicz, Joanna, et al JD&P Patent Attorneys Joanna Dargiewicz & Partners Ul. Mysliborska 93A/50 03-185 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Dargiewicz, Joanna WTS Patent Attorneys Witek, Sniezko & Partners ul. Weigla 12 53-114 Wroclaw / PL | Application number, filing date | 17749868.0 | 09.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017CA50153 | Priority number, date | US201662293730P | 10.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662293730 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017136940 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414929 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, G02B27/01, G02B7/00 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H04L63/0861 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/32 (KR);
A61B5/6803 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G02C11/10 (US);
G06F1/163 (KR,US);
G06F16/50 (EP,US);
G06F16/532 (US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/126 (EP,US);
H04W12/33 (EP);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/0533 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/1077 (EP,US);
A61B5/1112 (EP,US);
A61B5/1172 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | H04W12/06, G02B27/01, G02B7/00, H04W4/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG ODER REGISTRIERUNG VON BENUTZERN VON WEARABLE-VORRICHTUNGEN MITTELS BIOMETRIK | [2018/51] | English: | AUTHENTICATING OR REGISTERING USERS OF WEARABLE DEVICES USING BIOMETRICS | [2018/51] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION OU ENREGISTREMENT D'UTILISATEURS DE DISPOSITIFS VESTIMENTAIRES AU MOYEN DE DONNÉES BIOMÉTRIQUES | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 10.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 27.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2320263 (POZOR 360 D O O [SI]) [Y] 29,30* the whole document *; | [XI]US2014195815 (TAVEAU SEBASTIEN LUDOVIC JEAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0082] * [I] 2,5-8; | [I]US2014337221 (HOYOS HECTOR [US]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [XYI]US2014341441 (SLABY JIRI [US], et al) [X] 9 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0055] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 29,30 [I] 10-28,31-35; | [XI]JP2015194930 (SECOM CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0116] * [I] 6 | International search | [Y]US2007052672 (RITTER RUDOLF [CH], et al) [Y] 9-11, 16 * claims 13, 16-18, 22, 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US2014090039 (BHOW GUNJAN DHANESH [US]) [A] 1-35 * claims 1, 5, 7, 9 *; | [A]EP2793155 (KOO TAE EON [KR]) [A] 1-35* claims 1, 4 *; | [A]US2015073907 (PURVES THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * claims 1, 5, 8 *; | [Y]US2015082404 (GOLDSTEIN STEVEN [US]) [Y] 10, 16 * claims 16, 20, 21 *; | [A]US2015261946 (YOON BYOUNG-UK [KR], et al) [A] 1-35 * claims 11, 12; paragraphs 0038, 0040 *; | [Y]US2015358317 (DEUTSCHMANN INGO [DE], et al) [Y] 9 * claims 8-10, 15; paragraphs 0020, 0123-0124 * |