EP3413986 - AN AERODYNAMIC TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ninbee APS Wildersgade 46 B 2. 1408 København K / DK | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERNST, Christian Prinsessegade 58 2tv 1422 København K / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Roy Kulsviertoften 33 2800 Kgs Lyngby / DK | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Olesen, Birthe Bjerregaard Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 17749907.6 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017DK50037 | Priority number, date | DK20160070078 | 12.02.2016 Original published format: DK 201670078 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137052 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413986 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63B65/00, A63H33/18 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A63H33/18 (EP,DK);
A63B65/00 (DK);
A63B2225/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | A63B65/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | AERODYNAMISCHES SPIELZEUG | [2018/51] | English: | AN AERODYNAMIC TOY | [2018/51] | French: | JOUET AÉRODYNAMIQUE | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/34] | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 22.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3948523 (MICHAEL HENRY G) [X] 1,3-9 * figures 1-5 * [A] 2,10-15; | [XA]US5259802 (YANG MING-TUNG [TW]) [X] 1,3,5-12 * figure - * [A] 2,4,13-15; | [XA]US5536195 (STAMOS BRYAN W [US]) [X] 1,3,5-9,11 * figure - *[A] 2,4,10,12-15; | [XA]US5800236 (JOUN DAVIE [TW]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,13-15 * figure - * [A] 4,10,12; | [XA]US2005239366 (NUCCIO MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11,13-15 * paragraph [0038]; figures 1-3,9-13 * [A] 2,10,12; | [XA]US2012252611 (DEZORDO STEPHEN PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11 * figure 3 * [A] 4,7,9,10,12-15; | [XA]US2015328560 (RYBKA THEODORE WESLEY [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,13-15 * figure - * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0068] * [A] 2,4,7,9-12 | International search | [A]US3881729 (BLOCK MILTON L, et al) [A] 1, 2, 5, 7, 8 * , see column 4, lines 60-68 and column 5, lines 1-4 and figures. *; | [XA]US4176843 (DEWITT LESLIE JR [US]) [X] 1-3, 5-9, 11 * , see figures. * [A] 4, 10, 12-15; | [XA]US4940441 (NOVINSKY STEVEN [US]) [X] 1-3, 5-9, 11-5 * , see figures and colunm 3, lines 3-9. * [A] 4, 10; | [XA]GB2303311 (PROMOULD LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3, 5-9, 11, 13-15 * , see page 2, line 5-page 3, line 1 and figures. * [A] 4, 10, 12; | [A]US2001024923 (STREIT FRANK [DE]) [A] 1, 2, 5, 7, 8* , see [0026], [0030] and figures. *; | [XA]US2003022587 (CALCO WAYNE A [US]) [X] 1-3, 5-9, 11 * , see figures. * [A] 4, 10, 12-15; | [XA]US2005239366 (NUCCIO MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5- 9, 11, 13-15 * , see figures and abstract. * [A] 4, 10, 12; | [XA]US2011130229 (WILLIAMS KEVIN [US]) [X] 1-3, 5-9, 11, 12 * ., see [0029] and figures. * [A] 4, 10, 13-15 |