EP3414400 - MULTI-ORIENTED SEGMENTAL WALL BLOCKS, SOIL REINFORCING SYSTEM, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tensar International Corporation 2500 Northwinds Parkway Suite 500 Alpharetta, Georgia 30009 / US | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUPTAK, Stephen A. c/o Tensar International Corporation 2500 Northwinds Parkway Suite 500 Alpharetta Georgia 30009 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Aaron D. c/o Tensar International Corporation 2500 Northwinds Parkway Suite 500 Apharetta Georgia 30009 / US | 03 /
PERALTA, Andres F. c/o Tensar International Corporation 2500 Northwinds Parkway Suite 500 Alpharetta Georgia 30009 / US | 04 /
LIEW, Willie c/o Tensar International Corporation 2500 Northwinds Parkway Suite 500 Alpharetta Georgia 30009 / US | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/51] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17750691.2 | 08.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US17002 | Priority number, date | US201662292441P | 08.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662292441 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139369 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414400 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3414400 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02, E02D17/20, E04C1/39 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
E02D17/205 (EP,US);
E02D29/025 (EP,CN,US);
E02D17/20 (US);
E02D29/02 (US);
E02D29/0225 (CN);
E04B2/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | E02D17/20, E02D29/02, E04B2/00, E04B2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRFACH AUSGERICHTETE SEGMENTWANDBLÖCKE, BODENBEWEHRUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2018/51] | English: | MULTI-ORIENTED SEGMENTAL WALL BLOCKS, SOIL REINFORCING SYSTEM, AND METHODS | [2018/51] | French: | BLOCS POUR MURS SEGMENTAIRES À ORIENTATIONS MULTIPLES, SYSTÈME DE RENFORCEMENT DE SOL, ET PROCÉDÉS | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 12.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.05.2022 | AT | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | ES | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | IT | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | RS | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SI | 18.05.2022 | SM | 18.05.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | LU | 08.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/49] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US5480267 (HAGENAH GERHARD [DE]) [X] 40, 44-46, 48, 49, 51, 52, 55, 56 * ; figures 1-3, 8-14; column 3, lines 1-15, 21-44; column 4, lines 21-67; column 5, lines 1-16, 54-60 * [Y] 41-43, 47, 50; | [A]US5484235 (HILFIKER WILLIAM K [US], et al) [A] 1-28, 40-57* ; entire document *; | [Y]US5709062 (WOOLFORD MICHAEL E [US]) [Y] 42, 43 * ; figure 13; column 3, lines 52-65; column 6, lines 51-67; column 7, lines 1-33 *; | [Y]US6062772 (PERKINS GARRY R [US]) [Y] 41 * ; figures 1-3; column 5, lines 40-64 *; | [A]US2002030303 (MANTHEI BENJAMIN R [US], et al) [A] 1-28, 53-54, 57 * ; figures 3-6; paragraphs 25, 28 *; | [A]US2005279046 (GRAVIER ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-28, 53-54, 57 * ; figures 1-5; paragraphs 13-16 *; | [Y]US2009142145 (MARTIN CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [Y] 47 * ; figure 8; paragraphs 33, 36 *; | [Y]US2011107707 (MACDONALD ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 50 * ; figure 16; paragraph 69 *; | [A]US2013025223 (WOOLBRIGHT MARK A [US]) [A] 1-28, 53-54, 57 * ; figures 1-2; paragraphs 63-65, 79 * |