EP3413857 - PERSONAL MOBILITY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greater Mobility, Inc. 303 SE Osceola Ave. Suite 1 Ocala, FL 34471 / US | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Jacqueline 2401 S.E. 28th Street Ocala FL 34471 / US | [2019/02] |
Former [2018/51] | 01 /
MILLER, Jacqueline 303 SE Osceola Ave. Suite 1 Ocala FL 34471 / US | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17750932.0 | 12.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US17582 | Priority number, date | US201662294830P | 12.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662294830 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139721 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413857 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/053, A61G5/10, B60B33/06, B60B33/08 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
A61G7/1038 (EP,US);
A61G5/14 (EP,US);
A61G7/0528 (EP,US);
A61G2200/34 (US);
A61G2200/36 (US);
B60B33/06 (EP,US);
B60B33/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | A61G7/053, A61G5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR PERSÖNLICHE MOBILITÄT | [2018/51] | English: | PERSONAL MOBILITY APPARATUS | [2018/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE MOBILITÉ PERSONNEL | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 01.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6170501 (COOK CHRISTINE ANN [US], et al) [Y] 4,7 * figure 1 *; | [XY]GB2423113 (HARPER STANLEY ERNEST [GB]) [X] 1,2,8 * page 3; figures 1-2; examples 2,4 * [Y] 3-7; | [Y]US2010078052 (CLARK MICHAEL W [US]) [Y] 3,5,6 * figure 1 *; | [T]US2016000636 (JIE YEBING [CN]) [T] 8* figures 3-4 * | International search | [Y]US4554704 (RAFFAELI LIDIO P [US]) [Y] 10-11 * ; entire document, especially col 4 In 30-36 and Figs. 1 and 3-6. *; | [XY]US5983911 (STEELE RICHARD B [US]) [X] 1, 5-6 * ; entire document, especially col 4 In 41-45, col 9 In 51-54, and Figs. 1 and 5-6. * [Y] 4, 7-10; | [Y]US6170501 (COOK CHRISTINE ANN [US], et al) [Y] 4 * ; entire document, especially Fig. 1. *; | [Y]US6357077 (JONES JR LESTER R [US], et al) [Y] 8 * ; entire document, especially Fig. 3. *; | [Y]US6860281 (CLIFT DWIGHT H [US]) [Y] 7 * ; entire document, especially col 4 In 58-59 and Fig. 1. *; | [X]US7191477 (HAHN J ROLAND [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * ; entire document, especially col 5 In 53-59, and Figs. 1-2 and 28. *; | [Y]US7305737 (LIBAKKEN ROLF [NO]) [Y] 9-11 * ; entire document, especially Fig. 5. *; | [A]US2010078052 (CLARK MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1-11* ; entire document. * |