EP3484322 - BRUSH FOR THE APPLICATION OF COSMETIC PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PENNELLI FARO S.r.l. Via Ezio Vanoni, 37/A 26041 Casalmaggiore (CR) / IT | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Pennelli Faro S.R.L. Via Ezio Vanoni 37/A 26041 Casalmaggiore / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERPOSI, Gianluca c/o Pennelli Faro S.r.l. Via Ezio Vanoni 37/A 26041 Casalmaggiore (CR) / IT | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/21] | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Scaglia Est, 19-31 41126 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 17751839.6 | 30.06.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017IB53977 | Priority number, date | IT20160074568 | 15.07.2016 Original published format: IT201600074568 | [2019/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018011665 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484322 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3484322 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP,US);
A45D33/36 (US);
A45D34/042 (US);
A46B3/08 (EP);
A46B3/10 (EP);
A46B5/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜRSTE ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON KOSMETIKPRODUKTEN | [2019/21] | English: | BRUSH FOR THE APPLICATION OF COSMETIC PRODUCTS | [2019/21] | French: | PINCEAU DESTINÉ À L'APPLICATION DE PRODUITS COSMÉTIQUES | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 12.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2009038094 (KIM TAE JIN [KR]) [I] 1-8* paragraphs [0038] - [0045]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]WO2014013448 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-8 * pages 8-11; figures 1-24 *; | [X]FR3024825 (COSMOGEN SAS [FR]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-10 * * pages 5-9 * | Examination | DE60306287T | FR2939289 |