EP3504645 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADJUSTING BASAL ADMINISTRATION TIMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARADÓTTIR, Tinna, Björk Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
BENGTSSON, Henrik Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
BROCKMEIER, Pete Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
PEDERSEN, Jonas, Kildegård Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17752120.0 | 14.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017EP70588 | Priority number, date | EP20160185931 | 26.08.2016 Original published format: EP 16185931 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018036854 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504645 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H40/60 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP);
G16H50/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Validation states | MA | 26.03.2019 | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER BASALEN VERABREICHUNGSZEIT | [2019/27] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADJUSTING BASAL ADMINISTRATION TIMING | [2019/27] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉGLAGE DE SYNCHRONISATION D'ADMINISTRATION BASALE | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 26.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010091129 (ABBOTT DIABETES CARE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0106] * * figures 10, 11 *; | [A] - David Spero, "How Do You Use Basal Insulin?", Diabetes Self-Management, (20150204), pages 1 - 7, URL: https://www.diabetesselfmanagement.com/blog/use-basal-insulin/, (20170221), XP055348101 [A] 1-18 * page 3 - page 4 * | [A] - David Spero, "How Do You Use Basal Insulin?", Diabetes Self-Management, (20160808), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20160808082441/http://www.diabetesselfmanagement.com/blog/use-basal-insulin, (20170220), XP055347895 [A] 1-18 * page 3 * | [A] - Anonymous, "Basal Insulins", Diabetesnet.com, (20160729), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20160729045829/http://www.diabetesnet.com/about-diabetes/insulin/basal-insulins, (20170220), XP055347897 [A] 1-18 * page 2 - page 3 * | by applicant | US2011098548 | WO2015169814 | WO2010091129 | - SCHMID, "New options in insulin therapy", J Pediatria (Rio J, (20070000), vol. 83, no. 5, pages S146 - S155 | - DUNN et al., "An Updated Review of its Use in the Management of Diabetes Mellitus", Drugs, (20030000), vol. 63, page 1743 | - PLANK et al., "A double-blind, randomized, dose-response study investigating the pharmacodynamic and pharmacokinetic properties of the long-acting insulin analog detemir", Diabetes Care, (20050000), vol. 28, pages 1107 - 1112 | EP20160177080 |