EP3645960 - ARMOURED VEHICLE UNDERSHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Blast & Ballistic Systems Limited 10-11 St. James Court Friar Gate Derby, Derbyshire DE1 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Advanced Blast & Ballistic Systems Limited 10-11 St. James Court Friar Gate Derby DE1 1BT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOMAN, Roger Mark Hazlehurst Farm Mercaston Ashbourne, Derbyshire DE6 3BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | 01 /
SLOMAN, Roger Mark Hazlehurst Farm Mercaston Ashbourne Derbyshire DE6 3BH / GB | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 17752450.1 | 08.08.2017 | [2020/19] | WO2017GB52337 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019030465 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645960 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F41H7/04 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
F41H7/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | UNTERBODENVERKLEIDUNG FÜR PANZERFAHRZEUG | [2020/19] | English: | ARMOURED VEHICLE UNDERSHIELD | [2020/19] | French: | TÔLE DE PROTECTION DU MOTEUR POUR VÉHICULE BLINDÉ | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 31.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2020 | 31.08.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2099963 (APPRICH HARRY) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1574812 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [Y] 3-8,18-22 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] *; | [A]CN101273174 (TB COMPOSITES LTD [IE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [IY]US2009140545 (GREUTER ADOLF [CH], et al) [I] 1,2,9-17,23,24 * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] * * claim 6 * * figures 4-5 * [Y] 3-8,18-22; | [A]US2014318357 (PARIDA BASANT K [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |