EP3416978 - MULTIVALENT HIV VACCINE BOOST COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geovax, Inc. 1900 Lake Park Drive Suite 380 Smyrna, Georgia 30080 / US | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Harriet 620 Sand Hill Road Unit 124D Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17753803.0 | 16.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017US18103 | Priority number, date | US201662295779P | 16.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662295779 P | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017143016 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416978 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/21, C07K14/155, C07K14/16, C12N7/04, C12N15/63, C12N15/86 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP);
C07K14/162 (US);
A61K39/21 (US);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/161 (US);
C07K14/163 (US);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N15/8636 (US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
C12N2710/24143 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16023 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | C07K14/155, C07K14/16, C12N7/04, C12N15/63, C12N15/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | MULTIVALENTE HIV-IMPFSTOFF-BOOSTZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2018/52] | English: | MULTIVALENT HIV VACCINE BOOST COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2018/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS MULTIVALENTES VACCINALES DE RAPPEL CONTRE LE VIH ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 28.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2016049287 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,7,8,11-15 * the whole document, in particular examples 1-3 and claims 1-15 *; | [XD] - SUZAN L. BUGE ET AL, "Gp120-Alum Boosting of a Gag-Pol-Env DNA/MVA AIDS Vaccine: Poorer Control of a Pathogenic Viral Challenge", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES., US, (20031001), vol. 19, no. 10, doi:10.1089/088922203322493067, ISSN 0889-2229, pages 891 - 900, XP055625401 [XD] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document, in particular "construction of DNA and rMVA immunogens", abstract and discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/088922203322493067 | [AD] - SMITA S. IYER ET AL, "Codelivery of Envelope Protein in Alum with MVA Vaccine Induces CXCR3-Biased CXCR5 + and CXCR5 - CD4 T Cell Responses in Rhesus Macaques", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20150626), vol. 195, no. 3, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1500083, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 994 - 1005, XP055625382 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular study design and immunizations and discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1500083 | [A] - LETVIN N ET AL, "Potent, protective anti-HIV immune responses generated by bimodal HIV envelope DNA plus protein vaccination", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES (PNAS), US, (19970819), vol. 94, doi:10.1073/PNAS.94.17.9378, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9378 - 9383, XP002097492 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.17.9378 | [T] - XIAOYING SHEN ET AL, "HIV gp120 and Modified Vaccinia Virus Ankara (MVA) gp140 Boost Immunogens Increase Immunogenicity of a DNA/MVA HIV-1 Vaccine", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., US, (20171215), vol. 91, no. 24, doi:10.1128/JVI.01077-17, ISSN 0022-538X, XP055625363 [T] * the whole document, in particular page 14, left-hand column, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01077-17 | International search | [A]US2004146528 (MOSS BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 14, 35 * ; paragraphs [0061], [0173], [0175] *; | [Y]WO2014005958 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [Y] 7, 10, 28, 31 * ; paragraph [00290] *; | [A]WO2015009946 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [A] 1-20, 22A, 22B, 23-37* ; whole document *; | [Y]WO2015200673 (UNIV DUKE [US]) [Y] 4-5, 8, 11-12, 25-26, 29, 32-33 * ; paragraphs [0006], [0015], [0041] *; | [XY] - GOEPFERT, PA et al., Specificity and 6-Month Durability of Immune Responses Induced by DNA and Recombinant Modified Vaccinia Ankara Vaccines Expressing HIV-1 Virus-Like Particles, (20140107), vol. 210, no. 1, pages 99 - 110, XP055410056 [X] 1-3, 13, 15-20, 22A, 22B, 23-24, 34, 36-37 * ; abstract; page 100, column 1, paragraphs 2-3; DOI: 10.1093/infdis/jiu003 * [Y] 4-12, 14, 25-33, 35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/infdis/jiu003 | [Y] - FOUTS, TR et al., "Expression and Characterization of a Single-Chain Polypeptide Analogue of the Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 gp120- CD 4 Receptor Complex", Journal of Virology, (20001200), vol. 74, no. 24, pages 11427 - 11436, XP001156364 [Y] 6, 9, 12, 27, 30, 33 * ; abstract; figure 1; page 11429, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.24.11427-11436.2000 |