EP3500482 - A MOORING FRAME FOR MOORING A FLOATING UNIT AND A FLOATING UNIT COMPRISING SUCH A MOORING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Connect LNG AS Slemdalsveien 70B 0370 Oslo / NO | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNUTSEN, David, Mikal Thomas Heftyes gate 64A N-0267 Oslo / NO | 02 /
MAGNUSSON, Stian, Tunestveit Magnus' gate 7 N-0650 Oslo / NO | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17754354.3 | 18.08.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017EP70926 | Priority number, date | NO20160001328 | 19.08.2016 Original published format: NO 20161328 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018033623 | Date: | 22.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500482 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/00, B63B27/30 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
B63B27/30 (EP,NO,US);
B63B21/00 (EP,NO,US);
B63B21/50 (NO);
B63B2021/003 (NO);
B63B2021/005 (NO);
B63B2021/006 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | VERTÄUUNGSSTRUKTUR ZUM VERTÄUEN EINER SCHWIMMENDEN EINHEIT UND SCHWIMMENDE EINHEIT MIT SOLCH EINER VERTÄUUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2019/26] | English: | A MOORING FRAME FOR MOORING A FLOATING UNIT AND A FLOATING UNIT COMPRISING SUCH A MOORING FRAME | [2019/26] | French: | STRUCTURE D'AMARRAGE POUR L'AMARRAGE D'UNE UNITÉ FLOTTANTE ET UNITÉ FLOTTANTE COMPRENANT UNE TELLE STRUCTURE D'AMARRAGE | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 14.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02090176 (MOORING SYSTEMS LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 5, line 21 - page 9, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2009041834 (CAVOTEC MSL HOLDINGS LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-22* page 5, line 15 - page 10, line 23; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | US2004154518 | US2005097590 | WO2009048342 | WO2015107147 |