EP3491816 - BLOCK-BASED LENSLESS COMPRESSIVE IMAGE ACQUISITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia of America Corporation 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Xin c/o Nokia of America Corporation 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Gang c/o Nokia of America Corporation 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | 03 /
JIANG, Hong c/o Nokia of America Corporation 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | 04 /
WILFORD, Paul c/o Nokia of America Corporation 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 17754502.7 | 17.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017US42300 | Priority number, date | US201615223204 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: US201615223204 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018022337 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491816 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/335 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
H04N23/55 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/54 (KR,US);
H04N23/698 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/58 (KR,US);
H04N23/45 (KR,US);
H04N25/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | BLOCKBASIERTE LINSENLOSE KOMPRIMIERENDE BILDERFASSUNG | [2019/23] | English: | BLOCK-BASED LENSLESS COMPRESSIVE IMAGE ACQUISITION | [2019/23] | French: | ACQUISITION D'IMAGES DE COMPRESSION SANS LENTILLE À BASE DE BLOCS | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2012038786 (KELLY KEVIN F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * paragraphs [0165] , [0166] , [0211] - [0213]; figures 6,17A,17B * [Y] 3,5; | [Y]EP2685707 (VIRTUALMIND DI DAVIDE ANGELELLI [IT]) [Y] 3,5* figure 4 *; | [XI]US2016021390 (HAIMI-COHEN RAZIEL [US]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0053] , [0054]; figures 1,2 * [I] 2,4,8,10 |