EP3497104 - SOLID STATE FORMS OF LUMATEPERONE DITOSYLATE SALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH Schlüsselstrasse 12 8645 Jona / CH | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Assia Chemical Industries Ltd. 2 Denmark Street 49517 Petach Tikva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTELMAN, Ariel 13/4 Shimon Hatsadik St. Elad / IL | 02 /
FUCHS, Ido 48 Maskin St. Apt. 21 Petah Tikva / IL | 03 /
SHACHANTOV, Sharona Shrat Moshe 21/7 Kfar-Saba / IL | 04 /
RUDIK, Doron 9 Levona St. Modiin / IL | 05 /
SELLA-EREZ, Rotem 9/6 Sderot Chen St. Tel-Aviv / IL | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17754571.2 | 08.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017US45877 | Priority number, date | US201662372553P | 09.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662372553 P | US201662382479P | 01.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662382479 P | US201662382977P | 02.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662382977 P | US201662400358P | 27.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662400358 P | US201762486554P | 18.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762486554 P | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018031535 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3497104 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3497104 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/16, C07C309/30 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C07D471/16 (EP,US);
C07C309/30 (EP,US);
C07D471/06 (EP);
C07B2200/13 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | C07D471/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTKÖRPERFORMEN VON LUMATEPERON-DITOSYLATSALZ | [2019/25] | English: | SOLID STATE FORMS OF LUMATEPERONE DITOSYLATE SALT | [2019/25] | French: | FORMES SOLIDES DU SEL DITOSYLATE DE LUMATEPERONE | [2021/09] |
Former [2019/25] | FORMES À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE DE SEL DE DITOSYLATE LUMATEPERONE | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 09.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21200789.2 / EP4001281 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2022
06.07.2022
ADMISSIBLE Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street, Suite 900 New York, NY 10016 / US Opponent's representative Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2022
06.07.2022
ADMISSIBLE Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street, Suite 900 New York, NY 10016 / US Opponent's representative McNab, Donald C. Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 18.07.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.07.2024 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 23.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2020 | Decision despatched | 23.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | MT | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | TR | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | IE | 08.08.2022 | LU | 08.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
TR | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2009114181 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * pages 3-4 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0029] * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-20 * * figures 1-10 *; | [Y] - CAIRA ED - MONTCHAMP JEAN-LUC, "Crystalline Polymorphism of Organic Compounds", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY; [TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY], SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (199801), vol. 198, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 163 - 208, XP008166276 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * bridging paragraph *; pages 165-166 * * pages 177-180, paragraph 3.1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | by applicant | WO2008112280 | WO2009114181 | US8648077 | Opposition | WO2009114181 | - MR CAIRA, "Crystalline Polymorphism of Organic Compounds", Topics in Current Chemistry, Berlin, Germany, (19980100), vol. 198, doi:10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5, pages 163 - 208, XP008166276 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | - "United States Pharmacopeia-National Formulary ( USP -NF) official guidelines on performing solubility determinations for drug products and active pharmaceutical ingredients", (14052021), pages 1 - 13 |