EP3504355 - METHOD FOR DIRECTLY DEPOSITING PALLADIUM ONTO A NON-ACTIVATED SURFACE OF A GALLIUM NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2024/02] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, Andreas c/o Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | MKS IP Association Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17755493.8 | 21.08.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017EP71003 | Priority number, date | EP20160185352 | 23.08.2016 Original published format: EP 16185352 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018036951 | Date: | 01.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504355 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/16, C23C18/44, H01L29/872, H01L33/00, H01L33/32 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
C23C18/44 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1642 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/28044 (KR);
H01L33/007 (KR,US);
H01L33/32 (KR,US);
H01L33/325 (US);
H01L2924/1033 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIREKTEN ABSCHEIDUNG VON PALLADIUM AUF EINE NICHTAKTIVIERTE OBERFLÄCHE EINES GALLIUM-NITRID-HALBLEITERS | [2019/27] | English: | METHOD FOR DIRECTLY DEPOSITING PALLADIUM ONTO A NON-ACTIVATED SURFACE OF A GALLIUM NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTOR | [2019/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT DIRECT DE PALLADIUM SUR UNE SURFACE NON ACTIVÉE D'UN SEMI-CONDUCTEUR AU NITRURE DE GALLIUM | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 17.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4424241 (ABYS JOSEPH A [US]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102169930 (UNIV SHANDONG) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XDI]US2015249195 (HAN HEE [KR], et al) [XD] 14,15 * paragraph [0094]; example 1 * [I] 1-13; | [AD] - C.-C. HUANG ET AL, "Characteristics of a Pd/AlGaN/GaN Transistor Processed Using the Sensitization, Activation, and Electroless Plating (EP) Approaches", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20120831), vol. 159, no. 11, doi:10.1149/2.008211jes, ISSN 0013-4651, pages D637 - D641, XP055204905 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/2.008211jes | by applicant | US4424241 | WO2014086567 | US2015249195 | - HUANG et al., "Characteristics of a Pd/AIGaN/GaN Transistor Processed Using the Sensitization, Activation, and Electroless Plating (EP) Approaches", Journal of the Electrochemical Society, (20120000), vol. 159, doi:doi:10.1149/2.008211jes, page D637, XP055204905 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/2.008211jes | - LEWIS et al., "Electroless nickel/gold ohmic contacts to p-type GaN", Applied Physics Letters, (20080000), vol. 92, page 062113 |