EP3353853 - ANTENNA OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Dong Ryul 29-5 Dalseo-ro 18-gil Seo-gu Daegu 41804 / KR | 02 /
KOO, Young Gwon 408-1007 Shindonga Apt. 110 Dongjak-daero 29-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 06998 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ho Saeng 105-1401 Jugong Greenville Apt. 12 Sammak-ro Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13909 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Jin Woo 204 Seolleung Station Poongrim I-won Lemon Apt. 13 Teheran-ro 64-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 06193 / KR | 05 /
CHUN, Jae Bong 102-2104 Maetan e-Pyeonhansesang Apt. 20 Maebong-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16527 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Hyun Suk 501-805 Buyeong Apt. 132 Daecheon-ro Buk-gu Daegu 41429 / KR | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/48] |
Former [2018/31] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17756835.9 | 23.02.2017 | [2018/31] | WO2017KR02018 | Priority number, date | KR20160023548 | 26.02.2016 Original published format: KR 20160023548 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146497 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3353853 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3353853 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/04, H01Q13/10, H05K5/00, H04M1/02, G06F1/16 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/1637 (EP,US);
G06F1/1698 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/04, H01Q13/10, H05K5/00, H04M1/02, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG MIT ANZEIGE | [2018/31] | English: | ANTENNA OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING DISPLAY | [2018/31] | French: | ANTENNE DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UN AFFICHAGE | [2018/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 25.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | IE | 23.02.2023 | LU | 23.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | FR | 28.02.2023 | GB | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2023 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 28.02.2023 | ||
GB | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2023 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
GB | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008074330 (LIN YUNG-SEN [TW]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008316115 (HILL ROBERT J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2624363 (SONY MOBILE COMM JAPAN INC [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6014121 (ARATANI SHUNTARO [JP], et al) [Y] 2, 7-15 * See columns 5-6 and figures 4A-4C. *; | [A]JP2005538655 (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-4 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2012068905 (AYATOLLAHI MINA [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0026] and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]KR20130022177 (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0021] and figure 2. *; | [Y]US2014104762 (PARK SUNG-UN [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0079] and figures 3-9. * |