EP3419935 - WASTE MANAGEMENT IN ELECTROCHEMICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L3Harris Open Water Power, Inc. 28 Park Street Somerville, MA 02143 / US | [2022/40] |
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states Open Water Power, Inc. 28 Dane Street Somerville, MA 02143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVACS, Jason, R. 28 Dane Street Somerville MA 02143 / US | 02 /
PORTER, David, H. 28 Dane Street Somerville MA 02143 / US | 03 /
MCKAY, Ian, S. 28 Dane Street Somerville MA 02143 / US | 04 /
MILNES, Thomas, B. 28 Dane Street Somerville MA 02143 / US | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [2024/08] |
Former [2019/01] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17757162.7 | 23.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017US18994 | Priority number, date | US201662298877P | 23.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662298877 P | US201662361786P | 13.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662361786 P | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017147218 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419935 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3419935 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C25B9/00, H01M12/06, C02F1/46 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C25B9/00 (EP,US);
H01M8/0693 (US);
C25B1/00 (US);
H01M8/04201 (US);
H01M8/083 (US);
H01M8/22 (US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/46 (EP,US);
C02F2001/5218 (EP,US);
C02F2101/10 (EP,US);
H01M12/06 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0014 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | H01M12/06, C25B1/00, C25B9/00, C02F1/46 | ||
Former IPC [2019/01] | C02F1/461, C25C7/00, H01M4/80, H01M8/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABFALLBEHANDLUNG IN ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN SYSTEMEN | [2019/01] | English: | WASTE MANAGEMENT IN ELECTROCHEMICAL SYSTEMS | [2019/01] | French: | GESTION DES DÉCHETS DANS DES SYSTÈMES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 18.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 22.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0547512 (ELTECH SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10-12,14,16,17 * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 36; figure 1 * * column 8, lines 6-33 * * column 10, lines 27-35 *[I] 3,5,9,13,15,18; | [XI]WO2015076299 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10-12,14,16,17 * figures 1-9; claims 1-7 * [I] 2,5,9,13,15,18 | International search | [Y]US3067276 (GERHARD GRUNEBERG, et al) [Y] 1-10, 13-22 * ; col 1 lines 14-17; col 1 line 72, col 2 lines 1-6, col 3 lines 35-37, col 3 lines 62-63, col 3 lines 74-75 *; | [Y]US4305999 (ZAROMB SOLOMON) [Y] 1-10, 13-22 * ; entire document, but especially: col 1 lines 17-19, col 1 lines 27-30, col 2 lines 18-20, col 2 lines 48-53, col 3 lines 1-12, col 4 lines 22-24 *; | [A]US5004654 (HUNTER JOHN A [GB], et al) [A] 1-10, 13-22* ; entire document *; | [A]US2010316935 (FRIESEN CODY A [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 13-22 * ; entire document *; | [XP]US2016294000 (HE HUI [US], et al) [XP] 1-10, 13-22 * ; entire document * | by applicant | WO2015171849 | WO2016036795 | WO2015US29596 | WO2015US48046 |