EP3496764 - BITTER PRINCIPLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/25] | PRODUCTION OF BITTER PRINCIPLE DERIVATIVES | ||
[2020/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius-Maximilians-Universitaet Wuerzburg Am Sanderring 2 97070 Wuerzburg / DE | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYRWA, Ralf Burgstrasse 47 07715 Rothenstein / DE | 02 /
RODE, Claudia Am Birnstiel 8 07745 Jena / DE | 03 /
SEEMANN, Thomas Coppanz Nr. 19 07751 Bucha / DE | 04 /
MEINEL, Lorenz Heinrich-Zeuner-Str. 10 97082 Wuerzburg / DE | 05 /
RITZER, Jennifer Riemenschneiderstrasse 64 97230 Estenfeld / DE | 06 /
SCHNABELRAUCH, Matthias Burggarten 17 07745 Jena / DE | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17758824.1 | 11.08.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017EP70450 | Priority number, date | DE20161009766 | 11.08.2016 Original published format: DE102016009766 | [2019/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018029347 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496764 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3496764 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/12, C07C269/04, C07C237/20, C07C237/36 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A61K47/65 (EP,US);
C07C237/04 (US);
A61K47/186 (US);
A61K47/54 (EP,US);
C07C231/12 (EP,US);
C07C233/07 (US);
C07C269/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/12, C07C237/20 (EP,US);
C07C231/12, C07C237/36 (US,EP);
C07C269/04, C07C271/28 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | A61K49/00, C07C233/07, C07K17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BITTERSTOFFDERIVATE | [2020/03] | English: | BITTER PRINCIPLE DERIVATIVES | [2020/03] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE SUBSTANCES AMÈRES | [2020/03] |
Former [2019/25] | HERSTELLUNG VON BITTERSTOFFDERIVATEN | ||
Former [2019/25] | PRODUCTION OF BITTER PRINCIPLE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2019/25] | PRÉPARATION DE DÉRIVÉS DE SUBSTANCES AMÈRES | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 14.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.08.2017 | AL | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | LU | 11.08.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.08.2017 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 11.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1307250 (MAY & BAKER LTD) [X] 1 * example 13: 1-ethoxycarbonyl-3-[2-(N-benzyl-N-methylaminoacetamido)phenyl]thiourea hydrochloride; page 51, lines 85-87 *; | [A]WO2005063777 (CORUS PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * example 13 *; | [A]WO2013132058 (UNIV WUERZBURG J MAXIMILIANS [DE]) [A] 1-10 * pages 1,2,19; figure 3 * * pages 22,23 *; | [A] - ALFRED SAROLI, "Structure-activity relationship of bitter compounds related to denatonium chloride and dipeptide methyl esters", ZEITSCHRIFT FUER LEBENSMITTELUNTERSUCHUNG UND -FORSCHUNG., XX, (19860201), vol. 182, no. 2, doi:10.1007/BF01454242, ISSN 0044-3026, pages 118 - 120, XP055421926 [A] 1-10 * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01454242 | [X] - ZREGISTRY, SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140516), Database accession no. 1605618-01-6, XP002775339 [X] 1 * compounds 1605618-01-6 * | [X] - ZREGISTRY, SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140505), Database accession no. 1597451-18-7, XP002775340 [X] 1 * compounds 1597451-18-7 * | [X] - ZREGISTRY, SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140501), Database accession no. 1595199-59-9, XP002775341 [X] 1 * compounds 1595199-59-9 * | [X] - ZREGISTRY, SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140401), Database accession no. 1578182-21-4, XP002775342 [X] 1 * compounds 1578182-21-4 * | [X] - ZREGISTRY, SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20140328), Database accession no. 1575693-30-9, XP002775343 [X] 1 * compounds 1575693-30-9 * | by applicant | US5891919 | EP0955309 | WO2006062406 | - S. RODGERS et al., Chem. Senses, (20050000), vol. 30, pages 547 - 557 | - A. TROSZYNSKA, Pol. J. Food Nutr. Sci., (20040000), vol. 13, no. 54, pages 65 - 73 | - A. DREWNOWSKI et al., Am. J. Clin. Nutr., (20000000), vol. 72, pages 1424 - 1435 | - A. SAROLI, Z Lebensm Unters Forsch, (19860000), vol. 182, pages 118 - 120 |