EP3423598 - METHODS AND KITS FOR TRACKING NUCLEIC ACID TARGET ORIGIN FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Sequencing Technology Corporation 2351 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Zhoutao 6728 Whitesail Street Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 02 /
PHAM, Long Kim 7780 Stylus Drive San Diego, CA 92108 / US | 03 /
GU, Junchen 5220 Fiore Ter Apt. M207 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
LEI, Ming 6 Marie Ave. Sharon, MA 02067 / US | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17760756.1 | 01.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017US20297 | Priority number, date | US201662301967P | 01.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662301967 P | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017151828 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423598 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3423598 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6869, C12N15/10 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (US);
C12N15/1065 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C40B40/06 (US);
C12Q2563/185 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/514 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR VERFOLGUNG DES NUKLEINSÄURE-TARGET-URSPRUNGS ZUR NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZIERUNG | [2019/02] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR TRACKING NUCLEIC ACID TARGET ORIGIN FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET KITS DE SUIVI D'UNE ORIGINE CIBLE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE POUR LE SÉQUENÇAGE D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012106546 (UNIV WASHINGTON CT COMMERCIALI [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US2014194324 (GORMLEY NIALL ANTHONY [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2015189636 (ILLUMINA CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-22 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] *; | [YP]US2016369266 (BELYAEV ALEXANDER [US], et al) [YP] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A] - SASAN AMINI ET AL, "Haplotype-resolved whole-genome sequencing by contiguity-preserving transposition and combinatorial indexing", NATURE GENETICS., NEW YORK, US, (20141019), vol. 46, no. 12, doi:10.1038/ng.3119, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 1343 - 1349, XP055279286 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.3119 | International search | [Y]US2016046985 (DRMANAC RADOJE [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * claims 1, 21, 68; para [0018], [0043], [0050], [0081], [0100]-[0104], [0110], [0123], [0124], [0130], [0143], [0144], [0156], [0161], [0163], [0173], [0218], [0239], [0253]- [0256] *; | [Y] - MACOSKO et al., "Highly Parallel Genome-wide Expression Profiling of Individual Cells Using Nanoliter Droplets", Cell, (20150000), vol. 161, no. 5, pages 1202 - 1214, XP055323004 [Y] 1-40 * ; pg 1201, col 2; pg 1203, Fig 1 and its legend * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2015.05.002 |