EP3673243 - VIBRATORY METER WITH POINTED FLOW TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Motion, Inc. 7070 Winchester Circle Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Mark James 11787 N. Beasly Road Longmont, Colorado 80504 / US | 02 /
WEINSTEIN, Joel 3205 Martinique Avenue Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | 03 /
DESAI, Mitalee Nayan 2227 Canyon Boulevard Apt. 255 Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | 04 /
GRIFFIN, Clinton R. 765 High Street P.O. Box 432 Erie, Colorado 80516 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Ellis, Christopher Paul Ollila Law Limited Unit 7 The Courtyard Timothys Bridge Road Stratford upon Avon CV37 9NP / GB | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/27] | Ellis, Christopher Paul Ollila Law Limited Warwick Innovation Centre Warwick Technology Park Gallows Hill Warwick CV34 6UW / GB | Application number, filing date | 17761700.8 | 23.08.2017 | [2020/27] | WO2017US48181 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019040058 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673243 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3673243 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/84, G01F15/00 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
G01F15/00 (EP);
G01F1/8477 (EP,US);
G01F1/8404 (EP,US);
G01F1/8409 (EP);
G01F1/8422 (US);
G01F1/8427 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIBRATIONSMESSGERÄT MIT EINEM SPITZEN DURCHFLUSSROHR | [2020/27] | English: | VIBRATORY METER WITH POINTED FLOW TUBE | [2020/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE DE VIBRATION À TUBE D'ÉCOULEMENT POINTU | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 23.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS62170819 (OVAL ENG CO LTD) [Y] 7-10,17-20,30-32 * figures 1a,1b ** abstract *; | [XYI]US2009272200 (FRAHNOW ROMAN [DE], et al) [X] 11,13-16,24-26,28,29 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0002],[0029] * [Y] 1-10,17-23,27,30-32 [I] 12; | [Y]US2016202101 (SPARKS DOUGLAS RAY [US]) [Y] 1-10,21-23,27,30-32 * paragraphs [0013],[0014], [0028],[0033] * | Examination | JPS62170819 | US2009272200 | US2016202101 | US2017205373 |