EP3488384 - CROWDSOURCING AND DISTRIBUTING A SPARSE MAP, AND LANE MEASUREMENTS FOR AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. Shlomo Momo Halevi 1 9777019 Jerusalem / IL | [2024/27] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O.B. 45157, Har Hotzvim Jerusalem 9777513 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIDMAN, Ofer c/o Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O.B. 45157 Har Hotzvim 9777513 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
BELLAICHE, Levi Itzhak c/o Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O.B. 45157 Har Hotzvim 9777513 Jerusalem / IL | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17761919.4 | 21.07.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017IB01058 | Priority number, date | US201662365188P | 21.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662365188 P | US201662365192P | 21.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662365192 P | US201662373153P | 10.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662373153 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018015811 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488384 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G01C21/28 (EP,KR);
G01C21/3602 (KR);
G06V20/588 (CN);
G01C21/3819 (EP,KR,US);
G01C21/32 (CN);
G01C21/367 (CN);
G01C21/3815 (CN);
G01C21/3841 (CN);
G06F18/22 (KR);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06T7/277 (KR);
G06V10/94 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | CROWDSOURCING UND VERTEILEN EINER SPÄRLICHEN KARTE SOWIE FAHRSPURMESSUNGEN FÜR AUTONOME FAHRZEUGNAVIGATION | [2019/22] | English: | CROWDSOURCING AND DISTRIBUTING A SPARSE MAP, AND LANE MEASUREMENTS FOR AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE NAVIGATION | [2019/22] | French: | EXTERNALISATION OUVERTE ET DISTRIBUTION D'UNE CARTE ÉPARSE, ET MESURES DE VOIE POUR LA NAVIGATION D'UN VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 20.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.04.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 15.12.2021 | Appeal received No. T0630/22 | 15.12.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 21.02.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.04.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP21154158.6 / EP3843001 | EP21154882.1 / EP3843002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010098295 (ZHANG WENDE [US], et al); | [I]US2014086477 (YOU GANMEI [CN], et al); |