EP3526769 - INTER-PATIENT BRAIN REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Chen-Rui 562 Kendall Ave. Apt. 26 Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LIU, Ming-Chang 4162 Hamilton Park Drive San Jose, California 95130 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17761952.5 | 15.08.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US46974 | Priority number, date | US201615353679 | 16.11.2016 Original published format: US201615353679 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093430 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526769 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/32 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
G06T7/32 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/0012 (KR,US);
G06T3/02 (KR,US);
G06T7/30 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10004 (KR,US);
G06T2207/30016 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2207/30096 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | PATIENTENÜBERGREIFENDE GEHIRNREGISTRIERUNG | [2019/34] | English: | INTER-PATIENT BRAIN REGISTRATION | [2019/34] | French: | ENREGISTREMENT CÉRÉBRAL INTER-PATIENT | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 13.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - ERIN STRETTON ET AL, Predicting the Location of Glioma Recurrence after a Resection Surgery, SPATIO-TEMPORAL IMAGE ANALYSIS FOR LONGITUDINAL AND TIME-SERIES IMAGE DATA, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 113 - 123, (20121001), ISBN 978-3-642-33554-9, XP047017810 [X] 1-21 * Fig. 3 Abstract and Fig 2 see p. 117, 1st paragraph of the sub-section "Registration" p. 118, lines 2-4 * | [X] - ALI GOOYA ET AL, "Deformable Registration of Glioma Images Using EM Algorithm and Diffusion Reaction Modeling", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110201), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TMI.2010.2078833, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 375 - 390, XP011330313 [X] 1-21 * p. 381, Section V, 2nd paragraph. abstract p. 382, left column, 3rd paragraph starting at "Registration module..." and 1st paragraph of Section IV p. 381, left column, sentence after Eq. (23) starting at "Therefore, in the regions..." until paragraph's end * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2010.2078833 | [A] - HANS LAMECKER ET AL, "Atlas to Image-with-Tumor Registration based on Demons and Deformation Inpainting", ROC. MICCAI WORKSHOP ON COMPUTATIONAL IMAGING BIOMARKERS FOR TUMORS-FROM QUALITATIVE TO QUANTITATIVE, CIBT, (20100101), XP055412467 [A] 1-21 | [A] - THIRION, "Image matching as a diffusion process: an analogy with Maxwell's demons", MEDICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS, (19980101), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S1361-8415(98)80022-4, ISSN 1361-8415, page 243, XP055023013 [A] 1-21 * last paragraph of Section 4.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1361-8415(98)80022-4 | [A] - VERCAUTEREN T ET AL, "Diffeomorphic demons: Efficient non-parametric image registration", NEUROIMAGE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 45, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROIMAGE.2008.10.040, ISSN 1053-8119, (20090301), pages S61 - S72, (20081107), XP025947900 [A] 1-21 * p. S63 algorithm 1 p. S63, 3 first lines of right column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2008.10.040 | [A] - MATTHEW BRETT ET AL, "Spatial Normalization of Brain Images with Focal Lesions Using Cost Function Masking", NEUROIMAGE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010801), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1006/nimg.2001.0845, ISSN 1053-8119, pages 486 - 500, XP055412297 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/nimg.2001.0845 |