EP3427185 - BLUE LIGHT ADJUSTMENT FOR BIOMETRIC SECURITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - representative | 02.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Boulevard Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAEHLER, Adrian 1940 N. Western Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90027 / US | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/31] | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2019/03] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 17763797.2 | 03.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017US20767 | Priority number, date | US201662304556P | 07.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662304556 P | US201662304573P | 07.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662304573 P | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017155826 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427185 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3427185 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/19, G06F21/32, G06V10/141, G06V10/145, G06V40/18, G06V40/40 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06V40/19 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F3/013 (CN,KR);
G02B27/0172 (CN,KR);
G06V10/141 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06V10/145 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | G06K9/00, G02B27/01, G06F3/00, A61B3/11, A61B3/14, A61B5/1171, G06F21/32 | ||
Former IPC [2019/03] | G06K9/00, G02B27/01, G02B27/02, G06F3/00, A61B3/11, A61B3/14, A61B5/1171 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLAULICHTEINSTELLUNG FÜR BIOMETRISCHE SICHERHEIT | [2019/03] | English: | BLUE LIGHT ADJUSTMENT FOR BIOMETRIC SECURITY | [2019/03] | French: | AJUSTEMENT DE LUMIÈRE BLEUE PERMETTANT UNE SÉCURITÉ BIOMÉTRIQUE | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 23.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24191500.8 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013322810 (ROBBINS STEVEN JOHN [US]); | [I]US2015245766 (RENNAKER ROBERT [US], et al); | International search | [A]US6309069 (SEAL CHRISTOPHER H [GB], et al); | [A]US2013169683 (PEREZ KATHRYN STONE [US], et al); | [A]US2015304535 (SMITS GERARD DIRK [US], et al) | by applicant | US2014003762 | US2015016777 | US2015178939 | US2015245766 |