EP3427217 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTELLIGENT SALES ENGAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NewVoiceMedia Limited NewVoiceMedia House Jays Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states NewVoiceMedia Limited NewVoiceMedia House…Jays Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | ||
Former [2019/03] | For all designated states Newvoicemedia US Inc. 49 Stevenson Street Suite 1000 San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCORD, Alan 3580 Patriot Drive Frisco, TX 75034 / US | 02 /
UNITT, Ashley 51 Overton Hill Overton Basingstoke RG25 3PD / GB | 03 /
FELLOWES, Mark Wisteria Fir Drive Hawley GU17 9BX / GB | 04 /
CARSON, Andrew 12 Constable Close Woodley RG5 4US / GB | 05 /
ARDELEAN, Selma Flat 40 Sheperd's Court Shepherd's Bush Green London W12 8PN / GB | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
McCORD, Alan 3580 Patriot Drive Frisco, TX 75034 / US | ||
02 /
UNITT, Ashley 51 Overton Hill Overton Basingstoke RG25 3PD / GB | |||
03 /
FELLOWES, Mark Wisteria Fir Drive Hawley GU17 9BX / GB | |||
04 /
CARSON, Andrew 12 Constable Close Woodley RG5 4US / GB | |||
05 /
ARDELEAN, Selma Glat 40 Shephard's Court Shepherd's Bush Green London W12 8PN / GB | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17763939.0 | 07.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017US21221 | Priority number, date | US201662304926P | 07.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662304926 P | US201615193055 | 25.06.2016 Original published format: US201615193055 | US201615393978 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: US201615393978 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017156044 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427217 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 14.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q30/02, G06N5/00, G06N7/00 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
G06Q30/01 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06N7/01 (EP,US);
G06Q10/067 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1097 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | G06Q30/02, G06N5/00, G06N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM INTELLIGENTEN VERKAUFSFÖRDERUNG | [2019/03] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTELLIGENT SALES ENGAGEMENT | [2019/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENGAGEMENT INTELLIGENT DES VENTES | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013191185 (GALVIN BRIAN R [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0091] * | International search | [A]US7403904 (ABE NAOKI [US], et al)[A] 1-14; | [X]US2008288889 (HUNT HERBERT DENNIS [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * , abstract, paragraphs [0047], [0129]-[0131], [0173], [0324], [0328], [0423], [0424], [1059], [1069], [1106], [1166], fig. 1, 21 *; | [A]US8805861 (BOYAN JUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-14; | [A]US9275342 (VIJAYARAGHAVAN RAVI [IN], et al) [A] 1-14 |