EP3677087 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A NETWORK ENTITY FOR A CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK AND NETWORK ENTITY FOR A CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDER, Andreas Erthalstrasse 46 97074 Wuerzburg / DE | 02 /
PRASAD, Athul Talontie 8 B 16 00320 Helsinki / FI | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 17764537.1 | 31.08.2017 | [2020/28] | WO2017EP71923 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019042560 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677087 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3677087 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/00, H04W76/40 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H04W76/40 (EP,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | H04W76/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER NETZWERKEINHEIT FÜR EIN MOBILFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ UND NETZWERKEINHEIT FÜR EIN MOBILFUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2020/28] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A NETWORK ENTITY FOR A CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK AND NETWORK ENTITY FOR A CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2020/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION D'UNE ENTITÉ DE RÉSEAU POUR UN RÉSEAU DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE ET ENTITÉ DE RÉSEAU POUR UN RÉSEAU DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 29.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | IE | 31.08.2023 | LU | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
IE | 31.08.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2005027543 (HARRIS CORP [US]) [Y] 2-4 * page 4, line 27 - line 29 * * page 4, line 31 - line 33 * * page 5, line 4 - line 8 * * page 15, line 3 - line 11 * * page 15, line 18 - line 20 * [A] 1,5-13; | [XAYI]US2013148597 (LEE KI-HO [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,10,13 * page 3, line 1, paragraph [0043] - line 9 * * page 3, line 1, paragraph [0044] - line 4 * * page 3, line 6, paragraph [0044] - line 11 * * page 3, line 1, paragraph [0045] - line 4 * * page 3, line 1, paragraph [0049] - line 3 * [A] 12 [Y] 2-4,6 [I] 7-9,11; | [XA]WO2013127665 (TELEFONICA SA [ES]) [X] 1,13 * page 5, line 16 - line 19 * * page 5, line 21 - line 23 * * page 5, line 25 - line 27 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 3 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-12; | [A]WO2017099520 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13* page 14, paragraph [58] *; | [YA]EP3200498 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 6 * page 2, column 2, line 1 - line 11 * [A] 1-5,7-13 | Examination | WO2017131690 | EP3577856 |