EP3682444 - VOICE-CONTROLLED MANAGEMENT OF USER PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANCHAROV, Volodya Ankdammsgatan 29 17167 Solna / SE | 02 /
POBLOTH, Harald Mittspåret 29 18754 Täby / SE | 03 /
AMIAZ, Tomer 2 Reqanati Street 69494 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
GECHT, Hadar 35 Sheshet Hayamin st 4724735 Ramat-HaSharon / IL | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 17764594.2 | 11.09.2017 | [2020/30] | WO2017EP72705 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019048063 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682444 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G10L17/06, G10L17/22, H04H60/46 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
G10L17/06 (EP,US);
G10L17/22 (EP,US);
H04H60/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | SPRACHGESTEUERTE VERWALTUNG VON BENUTZERPROFILEN | [2020/30] | English: | VOICE-CONTROLLED MANAGEMENT OF USER PROFILES | [2020/30] | French: | GESTION À COMMANDE VOCALE DE PROFILS UTILISATEURS | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 08.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004003392 (TRAJKOVIC MIROSLAV [US], et al) [A] 10,11,20,21* paragraphs [0020] , [0044] *; | [A]US2004193426 (MADDUX SCOTT LYNN [US], et al) [A] 5,10,11,15,20,21 * paragraphs [0144] , [0154] , [0161] , [0165] *; | [XI]US9363155 (GRAVINO DOUGLAS D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12-14,16-19,22-26 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 7 * * figure 1 * * column 5, line 39 - column 5, line 41 * [I] 5,10,11,15,20,21; | [A]US2016291988 (ZIMMERMANN KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 10,11,20,21 * paragraphs [0111] , [0112] * | by applicant | US9363155 | - BOCKLET et al., "Age and gender recognition for telephone applications based on GMM supervectors and support vector machines", 2008 IEEE International Conference on Acoustics, Speech and Signal Processing, (20080331), pages 1605 - 1608, XP031250874 | - REYNOLDS; ROSE, "Robust text-independent speaker identification using Gaussian mixture speaker models", IEEE Transactions on speech and audio processing, (19950000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 72 - 83 | - REYNOLDS, "Comparison of background normalization methods for text-independent speaker verification", Proceedings of the European Conference on Speech Communication and Technology, (19970000), vol. 2, pages 963 - 966 |