EP3509444 - A CLEANING UNIT, A TOBACCO INDUSTRY MACHINE FOR PRODUCING MULTI-SEGMENT FILTER RODS AND A METHOD FOR CLEANING A TRAIN OF ROD-LIKE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o. Ul. Warsztatowa 19A 26-600 Radom / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKORA, Leszek ul. Piastowska 6/9 26-600 Radom / PL | 02 /
FIGARSKI, Radoslaw Odechowiec 94 26-640 Odechowiec / PL | 03 /
MUSIJOWSKI, Jan ul. Lipowa 9/5 00-316 Warszawa / PL | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 17765124.7 | 02.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017EP72035 | Priority number, date | PL20160418553 | 06.09.2016 Original published format: PL 41855316 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018046410 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509444 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3509444 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
A24D3/0225 (EP,US);
A24D3/0204 (KR);
A24C5/00 (RU);
A24D3/0229 (KR);
A24D3/0233 (EP,US);
A24D3/0254 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/027 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSEINHEIT, MASCHINE FÜR DIE TABAKINDUSTRIE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FILTERSTÄBEN MIT MEHREREN SEGMENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINER FOLGE VON STABFÖRMIGEN ELEMENTEN | [2019/29] | English: | A CLEANING UNIT, A TOBACCO INDUSTRY MACHINE FOR PRODUCING MULTI-SEGMENT FILTER RODS AND A METHOD FOR CLEANING A TRAIN OF ROD-LIKE ELEMENTS | [2019/29] | French: | UNITÉ DE NETTOYAGE, MACHINE UTILISÉE DANS L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC POUR PRODUIRE DES TIGES DE FILTRE À SEGMENTS MULTIPLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE D'UN TRAIN D'ÉLÉMENTS DE TYPE TIGE | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 05.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2017 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | TR | 29.07.2020 | IE | 02.09.2020 | LU | 02.09.2020 | FR | 29.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 02.09.2017 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 02.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.09.2017 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 02.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 02.09.2020 | ||
LU | 02.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3482488 (SEXSTONE JOHN H) [AD] 1-15 * column 5, line 4 - line 14; figure - *; | [AD]US3623404 (JACKSON NORMAN W) [AD] 1-15 * column 2, line 69 - column 4, line 2; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US5875824 (ATWELL CHARLES G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 9 - column 9, line 30; figure - *; | [A]US2003033685 (ERCELEBI AHMET [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figure - *; | [A]US2004020554 (SMITH BARRY S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figure - *; | [A]WO2013022360 (INT TOBACCO MACHINERY POLAND [PL], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | US3482488 | US3545345 | US3623404 | DE1432720 | EP0568278 | EP2286681 | WO2016139198 |