EP3494160 - SEMI-CRYSTALLINE THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER FOR PRODUCING BIAXIALLY STRETCHED HOLLOW BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 1 rue de la Haute Loge 62136 Lestrem / FR | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMEDRO, Hélène 246 rue du pont de pierres 62400 Bethune / FR | 02 /
SAINT-LOUP, René 3 avenue de la République 59160 Lomme / FR | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 31, rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | [2022/09] |
Former [2019/24] | Cabinet Plasseraud 31, rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17765219.5 | 02.08.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017FR52169 | Priority number, date | FR20160057491 | 02.08.2016 Original published format: FR 1657491 | [2019/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018024988 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3494160 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3494160 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/672, B29C49/08 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C08G63/672 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/0005 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/12 (US);
C08L67/025 (KR);
B29C2049/023 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | C08G63/672, B29C47/00, B29C49/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBKRISTALLINES THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYESTER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIAXIAL GESTRECKTEN HOHLKÖRPERN | [2019/24] | English: | SEMI-CRYSTALLINE THERMOPLASTIC POLYESTER FOR PRODUCING BIAXIALLY STRETCHED HOLLOW BODIES | [2019/24] | French: | POLYESTER THERMOPLASTIQUE SEMI-CRISTALLIN POUR LA FABRICATION DE CORPS CREUX BI-ETIRES | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 01.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2017 | AL | 02.03.2022 | AT | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | CZ | 02.03.2022 | DK | 02.03.2022 | EE | 02.03.2022 | FI | 02.03.2022 | HR | 02.03.2022 | LT | 02.03.2022 | LV | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | PL | 02.03.2022 | RO | 02.03.2022 | RS | 02.03.2022 | SE | 02.03.2022 | SI | 02.03.2022 | SK | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | BG | 02.06.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | GB | 02.08.2022 | IE | 02.08.2022 | LU | 02.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 02.08.2017 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
GB | 02.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.08.2017 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
GB | 02.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
GB | 02.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]US2012177854 (LEE ROY [KR], et al) [XD] 1-19 * example 1 * * paragraph [0014] *[Y] 1-19; | [IY]WO2015022254 (SEDA DE BARCELONA SA [ES]) [I] 1-19 * claim - * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 13 * [Y] 1-19; | [IY]US2015165668 (MCCRARY ROBERT ELLIS [US]) [I] 1-19 * claim - * * paragraphs [0228] , [0229] * [Y] 1-19 | by applicant | US6063465 | US6126992 | EP1882712 | US2011282020 | US2012177854 | WO2013062408 | - YOON et al., "Synthesis and Characteristics of a Biobased High-Tg Terpolyester of Isosorbide, Ethylene Glycol, and 1,4-Cyclohexane Dimethanol: Effect of Ethylene Glycol as a Chain Linker on Polymerization", Macromolecules, (20130000), vol. 46, pages 7219 - 7231 |