EP3431858 - VACUUM THERMAL INSULATION MATERIAL AND HOME APPLIANCE, HOUSE WALL AND TRANSPORT EQUIPMENT PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMA, Michihiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YUASA, Akiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17766128.7 | 07.02.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017JP04308 | Priority number, date | JP20160055439 | 18.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016055439 | [2019/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017159120 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431858 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/065 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
F16L59/065 (EP,US);
B32B15/085 (US);
B32B15/088 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
B32B2307/304 (US);
B32B2307/31 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | VAKUUMWÄRMEDÄMMSTOFF UND HAUSHALTSGERÄT, HAUSWAND UND TRANSPORTAUSRÜSTUNG DAMIT | [2019/04] | English: | VACUUM THERMAL INSULATION MATERIAL AND HOME APPLIANCE, HOUSE WALL AND TRANSPORT EQUIPMENT PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2019/04] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE À VIDE ET APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE, MUR DE MAISON ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE TRANSPORT COMPORTANT CELUI-CI | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2018 | Translation filed | 18.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 31.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008106532 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0127] *; | [XP]US2016187050 (ODAWARA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [XP] 1-7 * claim 6 *; | [E]WO2018016351 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-7* example 1 *; | [E]WO2018062048 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-7 * paragraph [0102] * | International search | [Y]JP2008106532 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0028], [0045] to [0072], [0091] to [0114]; fig. 1 to 2, 5 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011243613 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraph [0035] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013060524 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraph [0067] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013256574 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0121] to [0122] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009092224 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 6 * , paragraphs [0047] to [0054]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008208845 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0009]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009293770 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |