EP3431590 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ACTIVATED HEPATOCYTE GROWTH FACTOR (HGF) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Masashi c/o Eisai Co. Ltd. Tsukuba Research Laboratories 5-1-3 Tokodai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-2635 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Toshitaka c/o KAN Research Institute Inc. 6-8-2 Minatojima-minamimachi Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 6500047 / JP | 03 /
ARITA, Yoshihisa c/o KAN Research Institute Inc. 6-8-2 Minatojima-minamimachi Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 6500047 / JP | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17766718.5 | 15.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017JP10355 | Priority number, date | JP20160054128 | 17.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016054128 | [2019/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017159722 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431590 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3431590 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, C12N5/10, C12N15/09, C12P21/02 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
C12N9/6424 (EP);
C12N9/64 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07K14/4753 (IL,KR,RU,US);
C12N15/09 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N5/10 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N9/96 (IL,RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AKTIVIERTEM HEPATOZYTENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR (HGF) | [2019/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ACTIVATED HEPATOCYTE GROWTH FACTOR (HGF) | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE HÉPATOCYTAIRE (HGF) ACTIVÉ | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2018 | Translation filed | 22.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 22.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | LU | 15.03.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 28.07.2021 | |
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | FI | 28.07.2021 | |
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 28.07.2021 | |
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XA]JPH05103670 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [X] 9-13 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0015], [0018] to [0020] (Family: none) * [A] 1-8; | [A]JPH06153966 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [A] 1-13 * , claims; example 7 & US 5466593 A claims; example 7 & EP 596524 A2 *; | [A]JP2002356500 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0068] to [0072] & US 2002/0165362 A1 paragraphs [0140] to [0145] & EP 1213302 A1 *; | [A] - KIRCHHOFER, D. et al., "Tissue expression, protease specificity, and Kunitz domain functions of hepatocyte growth factor activator inhibitor-1B (HAI-1B), a new splice variant of HAI-1", J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, no. 38, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 36341 - 36349, XP002352472 [A] 1-13 * , particularly, p.36342(Cloning, Expression, and Purification of HGFA) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M304643200 |