EP3431598 - METHOD FOR COLLECTING NUCLEIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKIGUCHI, Shota c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries, Inc. 10-1, Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 02 /
SAWADA, Shinjiro c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries, Inc. 10-1, Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Mai c/o Basic Research Center Toray Industries, Inc. 10-1, Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17766759.9 | 16.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017JP10553 | Priority number, date | JP20160053830 | 17.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016053830 | [2019/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017159763 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431598 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/1006 (EP,US);
C12N15/09 (US);
G01N1/405 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTNAHME VON NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2019/04] | English: | METHOD FOR COLLECTING NUCLEIC ACID | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2018 | Translation filed | 09.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 27.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]TW201144037 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | International search | [A]US5234809 (BOOM WILLEM R [NL], et al) [A] 1-9* , entire text & JP 2-289596 A & EP 389063 A2 & NL 8900725 A *; | [A]JPH11313670 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text & US 6274387 B1 & US 6503762 B1 & EP 937497 A2 *; | [A]JP2007006728 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0035], [0036] (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2010155931 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN) [X] 6-8 * , claims & US 2010/0209710 A1 claims & EP 2202277 A1 *; | [X] - SONG, W. et al., "Ceria nanoparticles stabilized by organic surface coating activate the lysosome-autophagy system and enhance autophagic clearance", ACS Nano, (20140000), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 10328 - 10342, XP055420915 [X] 6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn505073u | [A] - PAUTLER, R. et al., "Attaching DNA to nanoceria: Regulating oxidase activity and fluorescence quenching.", ACS Appl. Mater. Interfaces, (20130000), vol. 5, no. 15, pages 6820 - 6825, XP055420918 [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/am4018863 |