EP3429423 - AIRLESS COSMETICS DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HCT Group Holdings Limited 11 Duddell Street Dina House (Building) Unit 202 2nd Floor Hong Kong / CN | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Jeremy 818 S. Gretna Green Way, Apt. 209 Los Angeles, California 90049 / US | 02 /
VILLARREAL, Armando 2486 S. Centinela Ave., Apt. 201 Los Angeles, California 90064 / US | 03 /
MAURIN, Denis 2546 Armacost Ave. Los Angeles, California 90064 / US | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17767191.4 | 09.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017US21618 | Priority number, date | US201662309029P | 16.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662309029 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017160593 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3429423 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D40/26, B05B11/00, B65D83/00, A46B11/00, // B05B1/20 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A45D40/262 (EP,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
A46B11/00 (US);
A46B11/002 (EP,US);
B05B11/001 (EP,US);
B05B11/0013 (EP,US);
B05B11/0035 (EP,US);
B05B11/0038 (EP,US);
B05B11/0041 (EP,US);
B05B11/1001 (US);
B05B11/1004 (EP,US);
B05B11/1052 (EP,US);
A45D2200/056 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1053 (EP,US);
B05B1/205 (EP,US);
B05B11/028 (EP,US);
B05B11/1015 (EP,US);
B05B11/1023 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | A45D34/04, A45D40/26, B05B11/00, B65D83/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | LUFTLOSER KOSMETIKSPENDER | [2019/04] | English: | AIRLESS COSMETICS DISPENSER | [2019/04] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE COSMÉTIQUES SANS AIR | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 17.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/34] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0357456 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * column 4, line 12 - column 7, line 51; figures 1, 7 *; | [XI]KR101252115B (YONWOO CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4; | [A]FR2998769 (ROLLET LAURENCE [FR], et al) [A] 12,13* page 2, line 23 - page 7, line 30; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2014234010 (THORPE TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 11 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1-13c * | International search | [A]JPH0572756U (KOTOBUKI & CO., LTD.) [A] 1-13 * See the whole document. *; | [Y]JP3628037B (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0025]; figures 1-15. *; | [A]KR20090087074 (BYUN YOUNG KWANG [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See the whole document. *; | [A]KR100935907B (BYEON JAE SAM [KR]) [A] 1-13* See the whole document. *; | [Y]KR200471796Y (AMOREPACIFIC CORPORATION) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0065]; figures 6-10. * | by applicant | EP0357456 | KR101252115B |