EP3429705 - PROTECTIVE TRAVEL GOLF BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. 345 Court Street Coraopolis, Pennsylvania 15180 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAESANG, Chinawut, Paul 135 Kerr Drive Beaver, PA 15009 / US | 02 /
NORTH, Richard, Ray 3 Newgate Road Pittsburgh, PA 15202 / US | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2019/04] | HGF Limited Merchant House 30 Cloth Market Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17767585.7 | 16.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017US22845 | Priority number, date | US201662309125P | 16.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662309125 P | US201662343499P | 31.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662343499 P | US201662422322P | 15.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662422322 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161209 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429705 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3429705 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63B55/00, A63B55/40 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
A63B55/406 (EP,KR,US);
A63B55/00 (CN);
A63B55/40 (EP,KR,US);
A63B2102/32 (CN);
A63B2210/50 (EP,KR,US);
A63B2225/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÜTZENDE REISEGOLFTASCHE | [2019/04] | English: | PROTECTIVE TRAVEL GOLF BAG | [2019/04] | French: | SAC DE GOLF DE VOYAGE DE PROTECTION | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 17.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2017 | AL | 05.05.2021 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | IT | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | TR | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5366075 (MILLS S DWIGHT [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YD]US5738208 (ROUBAL PAUL J [US]) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6029813 (SMOLENSKI GREGG J [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6263891 (HARTWELL MARK S [US], et al) [A] 5-10* figures 6-13 *; | [Y]US2013105341 (WHITWORTH CASEY C [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0082] , [0091]; figure 22 * | International search | [A]US4512465 (JOBE HOWARD L [US]) [A] 1-10 * ; entire document *; | [A]US5620034 (FLIS ALBERT J [US]) [A] 1-10 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US5738208 (ROUBAL PAUL J [US]) [Y] 1, 4-6 * ; figures 1-3; column 4, lines 64-67; column 5, lines 1-12 *; | [Y]US2002113385 (KANG PAN-GYU [KR]) [Y] 1, 4-6 * ; figures 9-11; paragraph [0059] *; | [A]US2005029762 (CHEN KWEI-PAO [TW]) [A] 1-10 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2006175782 (SHIN KI-DAL [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2008169211 (FRANZ RUDI [DE]) [A] 1-10* ; entire document *; | [Y]CN203060727U (ZHANG AIPING) [Y] 1, 4-6 * ; figures 2, 8; see machine translation * |