EP3429961 - METHODS OF FUNCTIONALIZING CARBON NANOTUBES AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FUNCTIONALIZED CARBON NANOTUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seerstone LLC 808 East 1910 South Suite 2 Provo, UT 84606 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Randall 267 East Kathryn Circle 84070 Sandy, Utah / US | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17767625.1 | 17.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017US22950 | Priority number, date | US201662310585P | 18.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662310585 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161258 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429961 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/158, C22C26/00, C08K7/24, C01B32/168, C08K3/04 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
C08K3/041 (EP,US);
C01B32/168 (EP,US);
C22C26/00 (EP,US);
C08K2201/004 (EP,US);
C08K2201/014 (EP,US);
C22C2026/002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/041, C08L101/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | C01B32/158, C22C26/00, C08K7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FUNKTIONALISIERUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRCHEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT FUNKTIONALISIERTEN KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRCHEN | [2019/04] | English: | METHODS OF FUNCTIONALIZING CARBON NANOTUBES AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FUNCTIONALIZED CARBON NANOTUBES | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FONCTIONNALISATION DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE ET COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT LES NANOTUBES DE CARBONE FONCTIONNALISÉS | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 12.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009142251 (KAJIURA HISASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] * * the whole document * [I] 2-10; | [X]EP2072635 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND [KR], et al) [X] 11-15 * paragraph [0035] ** the whole document *; | [XI]US2012009115 (GRIGORIAN LEONID [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0054] * * the whole document * [I] 2-10; | [XI]WO2014011631 (SEERSTONE LLC [US]) [X] 1,11 * page 13, lines 14-21; example 1 * * the whole document * [I] 2-10,12-15 | International search | [A]US2005205847 (DAILLY ANNE [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * See paragraph [0054]. *; | [A]US2006137718 (KIN KON-TSU [TW], et al) [A] 1-23 * See claims 1, 2, 4. *; | [A]US7887773 (KAJIURA HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * See column 5, lines 4-37; and claim 1. *; | [X]US2015225242 (NOYES DALLAS B [US]) [X] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0014], [0015], [0031], [0037], [0052], [0054], [0061], [0062] , [0066]. *; | [A]US2015291425 (MATSUMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23* See the whole document. * |