EP3510563 - IMPROVED PHASE-CONTRAST AND DARK-FIELD CT RECONSTRUCTION ALGORITHM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEHLER, Thomas High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2019/29] | Versteeg, Dennis John Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17767777.0 | 07.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017EP72463 | Priority number, date | EP20160187830 | 08.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16187830 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018046600 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3510563 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3510563 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
G06T11/006 (EP,US);
A61B6/5205 (US);
A61B6/032 (US);
A61B6/4291 (US);
A61B6/484 (US);
G06T11/003 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER PHASENKONTRAST UND DUNKELFELD-CT-REKONSTRUKTIONSALGORITHMUS | [2019/29] | English: | IMPROVED PHASE-CONTRAST AND DARK-FIELD CT RECONSTRUCTION ALGORITHM | [2019/29] | French: | ALGORITHME AMÉLIORÉ DE RECONSTRUCTION DE TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE À CONTRASTE DE PHASE ET EN FOND NOIR | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 08.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2021 | 23.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2017 | AL | 10.11.2021 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 07.09.2017 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.09.2017 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.09.2017 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO2013171657 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-7,9-13 * page 4, line 3 - page 8, line 20; figures 7,8,12,13 * [Y] 8; | [Y] - BERNHARD BRENDEL ET AL, "Intensity-Based Iterative Reconstruction for Differential Phase-Contrast Imaging with Reconstruction Parameter Estimation", 13TH INTERNATIONAL MEETING ON FULLY 3D IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION IN RADIOLOGY AND NUCLEAR MEDICINE, Newport, RI, USA, (20150531), pages 713 - 716, XP055234160 [Y] 8 * page 714, column l, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | WO2013171657 | - DONATH et al., "Inverse geometry for grating-based x-ray phase-contrast imaging", J. Appl. Phys., (20090000), vol. 106, page 054703 | - A YAROSHENKO et al., "Non-binary phase gratings for x-ray imaging with a compact Talbot interferometer", Optics Express, (20140000), vol. 22, no. 1, pages 548 - 556 | - P JOSEPH, "An Improved Algorithm for Reprojecting Rays through Pixel Images", IEEE Transactions on Medical Imaging, (19820000), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/TMI.1982.4307572, pages 192 - 196, XP055017824 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.1982.4307572 | - ROLF-DIETER BIPPUS et al., "Projector and Backprojector for Iterative CT Reconstruction with Blobs using CUDA", 11th Fully 3D conference, Potsdam, (20110711), pages 68 - 71, URL: http://www.fully3d.org/201 l/Fully3D201 IProceedings.pdf | - KOEHLER et al., "Iterative reconstruction for differential phase contrast imaging using spherically symmetric basis functions", Med. Phys, (20110000), vol. 38, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1118/1.3608906, page 4542, XP012145404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.3608906 |