EP3509866 - SECURITY DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states Hueck Folien Ges.m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | ||
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOURNIER, Frederic 11 Conway Drive Thatcham RG18 3AT / GB | 02 /
HOLMES, Brian William Gnomes Oak Fleet Hampshire GU51 5HZ / GB | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Ofner, Clemens, et al Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2021/01] |
Former [2019/29] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 17767887.7 | 06.09.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017GB52599 | Priority number, date | GB20160015258 | 08.09.2016 Original published format: GB 201615258 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018046915 | Date: | 15.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509866 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3509866 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/36, B42D25/29, B42D25/324, B42D25/21, B42D25/328 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/324 (EP,GB,US);
B42D25/21 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,GB,US);
B42D25/45 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/29] | English: | SECURITY DEVICES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2019/29] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE SÉCURITÉ ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2019/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 18.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2020 | Observations by third parties | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2021
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/45] | 20.10.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 01.09.2023 | Appeal received No. T1573/23 | 01.09.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 20.10.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.07.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | MT | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | IE | 06.09.2021 | LU | 06.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | DK | 06.01.2021 | |
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | DK | 06.01.2021 | |
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0103945 (FLEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-68* page 8, lines 6-8; figure 2B *; | [XI]EP1780040 (JDS UNIPHASE CORP [US]) [X] 1,36 * paragraphs [0015] , [0027] , [0030]; figure 4b * [I] 1-68; | [A]US2007273142 (TOMPKIN WAYNE R [CH], et al) [A] 1-68 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] - [0034] , [0064]; figures 5c,5d * |