EP3507835 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION DETECTOR COMPRISING CHARGE TRANSPORT ACROSS A BONDED INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G-Ray Switzerland SA Rouges-Terres 61 2068 Hauterive / CH | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON KÄNEL, Hans Röslistrasse 26 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Mötteli-Mantelli, Novella Da Vinci Partners LLC Rathausgasse 1 9320 Arbon / CH | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 17767918.0 | 29.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017IB01032 | Priority number, date | US201662381647P | 31.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662381647 P | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018042242 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507835 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3507835 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
H01L27/1469 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14632 (EP,KR,US);
H01L25/167 (EP,US);
H01L27/14634 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14643 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14658 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14661 (US);
H01L27/14676 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14694 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNGSDETEKTOR MIT LADUNGSTRANSPORT ÜBER EINE GEBONDETE GRENZFLÄCHE | [2020/26] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION DETECTOR COMPRISING CHARGE TRANSPORT ACROSS A BONDED INTERFACE | [2019/28] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE COMPRENANT UN TRANSPORT DE CHARGE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE INTERFACE COLLÉE | [2020/26] |
Former [2019/28] | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNGSDETEKTOR MIT LADUNGSTRANSPORT ÜBER EINE GEBUNDENE SCHNITTSTELLE | ||
Former [2019/28] | DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE COMPRENANT UN TRANSPORT DE CHARGE SUR L'ENSEMBLE D'UNE INTERFACE LIÉE | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 27.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2017 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | TR | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | IE | 29.08.2021 | LU | 29.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 29.08.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 29.08.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 29.08.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IE | 29.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
LU | 29.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0820104 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-45* figures 1,2,4 *; | [ID]WO2016097850 (G RAY SWITZERLAND SA [CH]) [ID] 1,3,4,8-27,33-45 * page 6, lines 25-31; figures 2-7 * * page 10 * * pages 12-14 * * pages 22,23,34 * * page 35 *; | [A] - SNOEYS W ED - UNNO YOSHINOBU ET AL, "Monolithic pixel detectors for high energy physics", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS, AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, (20131211), vol. 731, doi:10.1016/J.NIMA.2013.05.073, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 125 - 130, XP028771437 [A] 1-45 * figures 3-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2013.05.073 | by applicant | EP0571135 | US6410940 | US8237126 | WO2016097850 | - R.C. ALIG et al., Phys. Rev. B, (19800000), vol. 22, page 5565 | - R.C. ALIG, Phys. Rev. B, (19830000), vol. 27, page 968 | - S. KASAP et al., Sensors, (20110000), vol. 11, page 5112 | - G.W. DEPTUCH et al., IEEE Trans. Nucl. Sci., (20100000), vol. 57, page 2178 | - S. MATTIAZZO et al., Nucl. Instr. Meth. Phys. Res. A, (20130000), vol. 718, page 288 | - W. SNOEYS, Nucl. Instr. Meth. Phys. Res. A, (20130000), vol. 731, page 125 | - L. DEL SORDO et al., Sensors, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 3491 - 3526 | - C. FLOTGEN et al., ECS Transactions, (20140000), vol. 64, page 103 | - M.C. VEALE, Nucl. Instr. Meth. Phys. Res. A, (20140000), vol. 752, page 6 | - Y. KANG et al., Nature Photonics, (20090000), vol. 3, page 59 | - J. DAY et al., Appl. Phys. Lett., (20110000), vol. 99, page 031116 | - T. PLACH et al., J. Appl. Phys., (20130000), vol. 113, page 094905 | - I.P. FERAIN et al., J. Appl. Phys., (20100000), vol. 107, page 054315 | - J. WEBER et al., Phys. Rev. B, (19890000), vol. 40, pages 5683 - 5693 | - L. COLACE et al., IEEE Photonics Technology Letters, (20070000), vol. 19, pages 1813 - 1815 | - C.S. RAFFERTY et al., Proc. of SPIE, (20080000), vol. 6940, page 69400N | - I. ABERG I. et al., IEDM, (20100000), page 344 | - J.E. BOWERS et al., Proc. Of SPIE, (20100000), vol. 7660, page 76603H | - A. KISS et al., Rev. Sci. Instrum., (20130000), vol. 84 | - J.H. JUNGMANN et al., J. Am. Soc. Mass Spectrom., (20100000), vol. 21, page 2023 | - S. PROCZ et al., JINST, (20130000), vol. 8, page C01025 | - D. PENNICARD et al., JINST, (20140000), vol. 9, page 12003 | - M.D. HORNIG et al., Proc. of SPIE, (20120000), vol. 8313, page 831340 | - ABERG I. et al., "A low dark current and high quantum efficiency monolithic germanium-on-silicon CMOS imager technology for day and night imaging applications", International Electron Devices Meeting (IEDM, (20100000), pages 344 - 347 | - ALIG R.C. et al., "Scattering by ionization and phonon emission in semiconductors", Physical Review B, (19800000), vol. 22, pages 5565 - 5582 | - ALIG R.C., "Scattering by ionization and phonon emission in semiconductors. II. Monte Carlo calculations", Physical Review B, (19830000), vol. 27, pages 968 - 977 | - BOWERS J.E. et al., "High-gain high-sensitivity resonant Ge/Si APD photodetectors", Proc. of SPIE, (20100000), vol. 7660, doi:doi:10.1117/12.855030, page 76603H, XP055081673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.855030 | - COLACE L. et al., "Low Dark-Current Germanium-on-Silicon Near-Infrared Detectors", IEEE Photonics Technology Letters, (20070000), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1109/LPT.2007.907578, pages 1813 - 1815, XP011195995 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2007.907578 | - DAY et al., "III-nitride full-scale high-resolution microdisplays", Applied Physics Letters, (20110000), vol. 99, page 031116 | - DEPTUCH G.W. et al., "Vertically integrated circuits at Fermilab", IEEE Trans. Nucl. Sci., (20100000), vol. 57, pages 2178 - 2186, XP011312353 | - DEL SORDO S. et al., "Progress in the Development of CdTe and CdZnTe Semiconductor Radiation Detectors for Astrophysical and Medical Applications", Sensors, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 3491 - 3526 | - FERAIN I.P. et al., "Low temperature exfoliation process in hydrogen-implanted germanium layers", J. Appl. Phys., (20100000), vol. 107, page 054315 | - FLOTGEN C. et al., "Novel surface preparation methods for covalent and conductive bonded interfaces fabrication", ECS Transactions, (20140000), vol. 64, pages 103 - 110 | - HORNIG M.D. et al., "Design of a contrast-enhanced dual-energy tomosynthesis system for breast cancer imaging", Proc. of SPIE, (20120000), vol. 8313, page 831340 | - JUNGMANN J.H. et al., "Fast, High Resolution Mass Spectrometry Imaging Using a Medipix Pixelated Detector", J. Am. Soc. Mass Spectrom., (20100000), vol. 21, pages 2023 - 2030 | - KANG Y. et al., "Monolithic germanium/silicon avalanche photodiodes with 340 GHz gain-bandwidth product", Nature Photonics, (20090000), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/nphoton.2008.247, pages 59 - 63, XP055081675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nphoton.2008.247 | - KASAP S. et al., "Amorphous and polycrystalline photoconductors for direct conversion flat panel X-ray image sensors", Sensors, (20110000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.3390/s110505112, pages 5112 - 5157, XP055321407 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s110505112 | - KISS A. et al., "Microscope mode secondary ion mass spectrometry imaging with a Timepix detector", Rev. Sci. Instrum., (20130000), vol. 84, page 013704 | - MATTIAZZO S. et al., "LePIX: First results from a novel monolithic pixel sensor", Nucl. Instr. Meth. Phys. Res. A, (20130000), vol. 718, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nima.2012.10.098, pages 288 - 291, XP028875085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2012.10.098 | - PLACH T. et al., "Mechanisms for room temperature direct wafer bonding", J. Appl. Phys., (20130000), vol. 113, page 094905 | - PROCZ S. et al., "Medipix3 CT for material sciences", JINST, (20130000), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1088/1748-0221/8/01/C01025, page C01025, XP020237126 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1748-0221/8/01/C01025 | - RAFFERTY C.S. et al., "Monolithic germanium SWIR imaging array", Proc. of SPIE, (20080000), vol. 6940, page 69400N | - SNOEYS W., "Monolithic pixel detectors for high energy physics", Nucl. Instr. Meth. Phys. Res., (20130000), vol. A 731, pages 125 - 130 | - VEALE, M.C. et al., "Chromium compensated gallium arsenide detectors for X-ray and y-ray spectroscopic imaging", Nucl Instr. Meth. Phys. Res, (20140000), vol. A 752, pages 6 - 14 | - WEBER J. et al., "Near-band-gap photoluminescence of Si-Ge alloys", Physical Review B, (19890000), vol. 40, pages 5683 - 5693 |