EP3516553 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A 3D MODEL OF AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Interruption | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomodex Passage du Cheval Blanc 2 rue de la Roquette 75011 Paris / FR | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADJOU, Sidarth 11 rue Emmanuel Mounier 78370 Plaisir / FR | 02 /
MORA ESPINOSA, Mayra Guadalupe 44 Rue de Lévis Bâtiment C 75017 Paris / FR | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17768145.9 | 19.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017EP73621 | Priority number, date | EP20160189533 | 19.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16189533 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018050915 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3516553 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, B33Y50/02, G05B19/4099 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
G05B19/4099 (EP,IL,US);
B33Y50/00 (EP,IL,US);
G06F30/00 (EP,IL,US);
G06F30/20 (IL,US);
G06F30/23 (EP,IL,US);
G05B2219/49023 (IL,US);
G06F2111/06 (EP,IL,US);
G06F2113/10 (US);
G06F2113/26 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES 3D-MODELLS EINES OBJEKTS | [2019/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A 3D MODEL OF AN OBJECT | [2019/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN MODÈLE 3D D'UN OBJET | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 23.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 28.09.2023 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2024/03] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012185218 (BICKEL BERND [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0093] ** figures 1,3,5 *; | [I]US2014046469 (BICKEL BERND [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0175] *; | [A]US2016096318 (BICKEL BERND [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0105] * * figure 4 *; | [I] - MÉLINA SKOURAS ET AL, "Computational design of actuated deformable characters", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), US, (20130701), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.1145/2461912.2461979, ISSN 0730-0301, page 1, XP055361120 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 82:2, column 2, paragraph 5 * * figure 2 * * page 82:5, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 82:6, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 6-7 * * page 82:6, column 2, paragraph 3; figure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2461912.2461979 | [I] - HONGYI XU ET AL, "Interactive Material Design Using Model Reduction", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), ACM, US, (20150302), vol. 34, no. 2, doi:10.1145/2699648, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 1 - 14, XP058065798 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 18:4, column 1, paragraphs 3-4 * * page 18:6, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 4 * * page 18:7, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 6 * * figure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2699648 | by applicant | US8565909 | - HONGYI XU, Interactive Material Design Using Model Reduction, ACM Transactions on Graphics, (20150200), vol. 34 | - "Computational Design of Actuated Deformable Characters", MELINA SKOURAS et al., Conference Proceedings TOG Homepage, ACM Transactions on Graphics (TOG) - SIGGRAPH, (20130700), vol. 32 |