EP3512881 - TREATMENT OF NON-HODGKIN LYMPHOMA USING LILOTOMAB AND 177LU-LILOTOMAB SATETRAXETAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordic Nanovector ASA Kjelsåsveien 168B 0884 Oslo / NO | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHLE, Jostein Vallerveien 106 A 1344 Haslum / NO | 02 /
TURNER, Simon c/o Nordic Nanovector ASA Kjelsåsveien 168 B 0884 Oslo / NO | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | Aera A/S Gammel Kongevej 60, 18th floor 1850 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 17768448.7 | 15.09.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017EP73336 | Priority number, date | EP20160189191 | 16.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16189191 | EP20170164164 | 31.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17164164 | EP20170170641 | 11.05.2017 Original published format: EP 17170641 | EP20170175768 | 13.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17175768 | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018050851 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512881 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K51/10, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
A61K51/1096 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/1069 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/0482 (KR);
A61K51/1027 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (KR);
C07K16/2887 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2896 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/3061 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON NON-HODGKIN-LYMPHOM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LILOTOMAB UND 177LU-LILOTOMAB-SATETRAXETAN | [2019/30] | English: | TREATMENT OF NON-HODGKIN LYMPHOMA USING LILOTOMAB AND 177LU-LILOTOMAB SATETRAXETAN | [2019/30] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LYMPHOME NON HODGKINIEN À L'AIDE DE LILOTOMAB ET DE 177LU-LILOTOMAB SATETRAXETAN | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 15.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI] - JOHAN BLAKKISRUD ET AL, "Red Marrow-Absorbed Dose for Non-Hodgkin Lymphoma Patients Treated with 177 Lu-Lilotomab Satetraxetan, a Novel Anti-CD37 Antibody-Radionuclide Conjugate", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, US, (20160901), vol. 58, no. 1, doi:10.2967/jnumed.116.180471, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 55 - 61, XP055420342 [X] 1-3,8,10,11,15-18 * whole document, especially the Abstract; page 56, second full paragraph; page 57, right-hand column, second paragraph; Tables 1-2; Figures 2-3 * [A] 19,20 [I] 4-7,9,12-14,21-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.116.180471 | [XAI] - JOHAN BLAKKISRUD ET AL, "Tumor-Absorbed Dose for Non-Hodgkin Lymphoma Patients Treated with the Anti-CD37 Antibody Radionuclide Conjugate 177 Lu-Lilotomab Satetraxetan", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, US, (20160804), vol. 58, no. 1, doi:10.2967/jnumed.116.173922, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 48 - 54, XP055420455 [X] 1-4,8-11,16-18 * whole document, especially the Abstract; page 49, first full paragraph * [A] 19,20 [I] 5-7,12-15,21-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.116.173922 | [XAI] - Arne Kolstad ET AL, "PRE-DOSING WITH UNLABELLED ANTIBODY SIGNIFICANTLY INCREASES THE PHARMACOKINETIC EXPOSURE BUT PROTECTS AGAINST MYELOSUPPRESSION OF 177LU-LILOTOMAB IN NON-HODGKIN B-CELL LYMPHOMA PATIENTS", (20160609), page E1165, URL: https://learningcenter.ehaweb.org/eha/2016/21st/132714/arne.kolstad.pre-dosing.with.unlabelled.antibody.significantly.increases.the.html?f=m3e968, (20171101), XP055420926 [X] 1-4,9-11,14,16-18 * the whole document * [A] 19,20 [I] 5-8,12,13,15,21-24 | [XPI] - Arne Kolstad ET AL, "A HIGHER AMOUNT OF LILOTOMAB PRE-DOSING INCREASES THEACTIVITY-ADJUSTED AUC AND HAS A PROTECTIVE EFFECT AGAINSTMYELOSUPPRESSION OF LUTETIUM (177LU)-LILOTOMABSATETRAXETAN IN INDOLENT NHL PATIENTS", (20170518), page E1141, URL: https://learningcenter.ehaweb.org/eha/2017/22nd/180917/arne.kolstad.md.a.higher.amount.of.lilotomab.pre-dosing.increases.the.html, (20171101), XP055420928 [XP] 1-4,7,8,10,16-18 * the whole document * [I] 5,6,9,11-15,19-24 |