EP3515560 - COPOLYMER COMPOSITION FOR COATING AND ADHESIVE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIZHONG, Zhu 1212 Marriet Court Midland MI 48640 / US | 02 /
GRASMANN, Martin 6108 Summerset Drive Midland MI 48640 / US | 03 /
PANDIT, Vinita 5019 Foxpoint Circle Midland MI 48642 / US | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17768537.7 | 18.08.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017US47468 | Priority number, date | US201662396336P | 19.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662396336 P | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018052646 | Date: | 22.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3515560 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/02, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61K8/898, C08G18/61, C09D175/04, A61K9/70, C09J175/04, A61F13/02 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
A61K9/7069 (EP,KR);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C08L83/04 (KR,US);
A61F13/0253 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/045 (US);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K31/19 (US);
A61K31/192 (US);
A61K31/245 (US);
A61K31/405 (US);
A61K31/616 (US);
A61K33/38 (US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K8/0208 (KR);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61L15/58 (KR);
A61L24/04 (KR);
A61L24/043 (US);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP,KR);
C08G18/227 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP,KR);
C08G18/4833 (EP,KR);
C08G18/61 (EP,KR);
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08G18/7621 (EP);
C08L75/06 (US);
C09D175/04 (EP,KR);
C09D175/06 (US);
C09D183/04 (KR,US);
C09D7/40 (KR);
C09J175/04 (EP,KR);
C09J175/06 (US);
C09J183/04 (KR,US);
A61F2013/00659 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Title | German: | COPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BESCHICHTUNG UND FÜR KLEBSTOFFANWENDUNGEN | [2019/31] | English: | COPOLYMER COMPOSITION FOR COATING AND ADHESIVE APPLICATIONS | [2019/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMÈRE POUR APPLICATIONS D'ADHÉSIF ET DE REVÊTEMENT | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 12.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH04292676 ; | [X]US4840796 (SWEET RANDALL P [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 26 * * pages 1-6 *; | [XI]EP0338820 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-8,10-14 * page 1, line 35 - page 1, line 40 * * examples 1, 3 * [I] 9; | [XI]US5756572 (SWEET RANDALL P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-14 * column 7, line 15 - column 7, line 35 * * column 8, line 52 - column 8, line 67 * [I] 4,5,8,9; | [X]US2004254325 (KUEPFER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,12-15 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * examples 1-6 ** claim 1 *; | [X]EP1588686 (INTERCOS ITALIANA [IT]) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-11 *; | [X]US2006247403 (NGUYEN-KIM SON [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples C, D, F-K *; | [XI]US2007071700 (ABHIMANYU PATIL ANJALI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-14 * examples 1-8 * [I] 4,5; | [X]US2007154440 (FLEISSMAN LEONA G [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0048] * * example 2 *; | [X]DE102006056379 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,12-15 * paragraph [0073] * * examples 1-6 *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 48, Database accession no. 1992-394001, XP002775963 & JPH04292676 A 19921016 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [X] 1-7,12-14 * abstract * [I] 15 | by applicant | US3384623 | US4840796 | US4951657 | US5200491 | US5621024 | US5756572 | US5998694 | US6528121 | US2005048104 | US2005163978 | US2007172518 | WO2007092350 | CA2585933 | WO2008088491 | US7452956 | US2009105670 | WO2013030580 | WO2014116281 | US2014323941 | US2015031797 | WO2015075448 | WO2015097064 | WO2015100258 | US2015313593 | WO2016126362 |