EP3507479 - PISTON CONSISTING OF AN INNER PART AND AN OUTER PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KS Kolbenschmidt GmbH Karl-Schmidt-Strasse 74172 Neckarsulm / DE | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Gregor Wingertstr. 45 68199 Mannheim / DE | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17768687.0 | 30.08.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017EP71737 | Priority number, date | DE201610116474 | 02.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016116474 | [2019/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018041880 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507479 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02F3/00 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
F02F3/003 (EP,US);
F02F3/22 (EP,US);
F02F2003/0061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | KOLBEN, BESTEHEND AUS EINEM INNENTEIL UND EINEM AUSSENTEIL | [2019/28] | English: | PISTON CONSISTING OF AN INNER PART AND AN OUTER PART | [2019/28] | French: | PISTON CONSTITUÉ D'UNE PARTIE INTÉRIEURE ET D'UNE PARTIE EXTÉRIEURE | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 23.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/30] | Request for further processing for: | 17.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE475508 (MIDLAND MOTOR CYLINDER COMPANY, et al) [X] 1,6,7,9 * abstract * * claim 1 * * page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 19 *; | [X]FR663296 (FERNAND ROUX) [X] 1,4,7 * page 1, line 41 - page 2, line 12 ** abstract *; | [X]GB748735 (NAPIER & SON LTD) [X] 1,3,7 * abstract * * page 3, line 32 - line 47 * * page 2, line 72 - line 106 *; | [X]EP0144145 (AE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * Seite 10, letzter Absatz bis Seite 13, erster Absatz * * abstract *; | [X]DE102009041392 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * paragraph [0017] * * abstract * * claims 1,2,3,4,6,7 * * paragraph [0023] * | by applicant | DE102016116046 |