EP3432732 - CORN PROTEIN PRODUCT HAVING DECREASED FREE SULFITE LEVELS&METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | 19.02.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 Mcginty Road West Mail Stop 24 Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTER, Michael A. 9123 Sycamore Lane North Maple Grove, Minnesota 55369 / US | 02 /
YEHIA, Hadi Nayef 2594 Sapphire Pointe 16 Beavercreek, Ohio 45431 / US | 03 /
ZHENG, Guo-Hua 2485 Briggs Road Centerville, Ohio 45459 / US | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Jantschy, Jasmin Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17771224.7 | 24.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017US23988 | Priority number, date | US201662312798P | 24.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662312798 P | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017165748 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432732 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23L5/20, C01D5/16, C07K14/415, A23J1/00 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
A23L7/198 (EP,US);
A23J1/006 (EP,US);
A23J1/14 (EP);
A23J3/14 (EP);
A23L5/20 (EP,US);
A23L5/23 (EP,US);
A23L5/276 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C07K14/425 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | A23L5/20, C01D5/16, C07K14/415 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | MAISPROTEINPRODUKT MIT VERMINDERTEN ANTEILEN AN FREIEM SULFIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/05] | English: | CORN PROTEIN PRODUCT HAVING DECREASED FREE SULFITE LEVELS&METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2019/05] | French: | PRODUIT DE PROTÉINE DE MAÏS AUX TAUX DE SULFITE LIBRE RÉDUITS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP21156849.8 / EP3858153 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5754564 ; | [X]CN101703146B (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [XI]CN102669406 (SHANDONG LUZHOU FOOD GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7-12 * abstract * [I] 4; | [X]CN104938763 (COFCO NUTRITION & HEALTH RES INST CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-12 * abstract *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 19, Database accession no. 1982-38049E, XP002794657 & JPS5754564 A 19820401 (NIPPON SHOKUHIN KAKO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2006182857 (THORRE DOUG V [US]) [Y] 9-10, 15, 18 * ; paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]US2010159521 (CIRAKOVIC JELENA [US], et al) [Y] 13, 25-26, 31-32 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0062], [0114], [0116], [0131], [0151] *; | [XY]JP2011097928 (SANWA DENBUN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-8, 11-12 * ; abstract; claims 10 and 12; paragraphs [0018], [0021], [0024], [0032], [0038], [0052]; page 2, second column, fifth paragraph; fifth paragraph; page 8, third paragraph * [Y] 9-10, 13, 15-27, 29-38; | [A]CN103554278 (SHANDONG XIWANG SUGAR INDUSTRY CO LTD) [A] 14* ; paragraphs [0017], [0020] *; | [Y]KR101409213B (DAESANG CORP [KR]) [Y] 13, 15-18, 19-24, 27, 33-38 * ; abstract; page 5, second and sixth paragraphs; page 6, third paragraph; page 7, third and fourth paragraphs; page 9, table 1; page 10, table 1 continued *; | [Y]WO2014186567 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [Y] 13, 29-30 * ; page 3, lines 3-5; page 22, lines 8-13; page 24, lines 11-12 and lines 24-26 *; | [A] - "Hydrogen Peroxide Controlling reduced sulphur compounds", SOLVAY INTEROX, (20010300), URL: http://www.solvay.com.au/en/binaries/Contolling%20reduced%20suphur%20species-202502.pdf, (20170525), XP055423588 [A] 14 * ; page 5, first paragraph and first molecular equation * |