EP3520235 - USE OF DOWNLINK BEAM TRACKING RESULTS IN REFERENCE SYMBOL SESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISLAM, Muhammad Nazmul 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SADIQ, Bilal 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SAMPATH, Ashwin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LI, Junyi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
RAGHAVAN, Vasanthan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17772584.3 | 15.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US51761 | Priority number, date | US201662401794P | 29.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662401794 P | US201715618815 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: US201715618815 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018063823 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520235 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0456 (US);
H04B7/0621 (EP,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04W16/28 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DOWNLINK-STRAHLVERFOLGUNGSERGEBNISSEN IN REFERENZSYMBOLSITZUNGEN | [2019/32] | English: | USE OF DOWNLINK BEAM TRACKING RESULTS IN REFERENCE SYMBOL SESSIONS | [2019/32] | French: | UTILISATION DE RÉSULTATS DE SUIVI DE FAISCEAU DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE DANS DES SESSIONS DE SYMBOLES DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/21] | 16.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2016261325 (KO HYUNSOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,5-8,11,15,19-22,25 * paragraph [0237] - paragraph [0269] * * figure 24 *[I] 2-4,9,10,12-14,16-18,23,24,26-28 |