EP3519016 - A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHABBACH, Michael c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
FRANKE, Beate c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
PRADEL, Giuliano Via Papa Giovanni XXIII no 42 35010 Massanzago (PD) / IT | 04 /
MELZI, Ilario Via Castagnone, 2 20063 Milano (Mi) / IT | 05 /
VERLAAK, Stefan Via Cascina S. Antonio 2 23877 Paderno d'Adda (LC) / IT | 06 /
NELSON, Andrew 4174 Wilada Drive Dallas Texas TX 75220 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Brown, Alexander Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17772666.8 | 20.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017EP73722 | Priority number, date | EP20160190881 | 27.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16190881 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060024 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519016 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/148, A61M5/20, A61M5/142, A61M5/145 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61M5/2033 (EP,US);
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/148 (EP,US);
A61M5/282 (US);
A61M5/283 (US);
A61M5/322 (US);
A61M2005/14256 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14272 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14506 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENTENABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/32] | English: | A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY DEVICE | [2019/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 29.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9734651 (MCPHEE CHARLES J [US]); | [A]US2002022798 (CONNELLY ROBERT I [US], et al); | [X]WO2012073035 (OVAL MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB], et al) |