EP3518770 - TRACKING A FEATURE OF AN INTERVENTIONAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAPERT, Hendrik, Roelof High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GÖKGÜRLER, Mustafa, Hakan High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KORTSMIT, Jeroen High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
VAN DE PAS, Stefan High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Fairley, Peter Douglas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17772739.3 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017EP74905 | Priority number, date | EP20160191651 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16191651 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060499 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518770 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B8/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61B5/066 (US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/4245 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/4477 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (US);
A61B8/483 (US);
A61B8/5246 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | VERFOLGEN EINES MERKMALS EINER EINGRIFFSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/32] | English: | TRACKING A FEATURE OF AN INTERVENTIONAL DEVICE | [2019/32] | French: | SUIVI D'UNE ENTITÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF D'INTERVENTION | [2024/27] |
Former [2019/32] | SUIVI D'UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'INTERVENTION | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003060700 (SOLF TORSTEN [DE], et al); | [X]US2014276003 (WANG HONG [CN], et al); | [AD]WO2015101949 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [XI]US2016242856 (JAIN AMEET KUMAR [US], et al) | by applicant | US4249539 | WO2011138698 | WO2015101949 | WO2016009350 |