EP3438052 - INORGANIC OXIDE MICROPARTICLES HAVING AMPHIPHILIC ORGANIC SILANE COMPOUND BONDED THERETO, ORGANIC SOLVENT DISPERSION THEREOF, AND COMPOSITION FOR FILM FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1 Kandanishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Natsumi c/o Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Materials Research Laboratories 11-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | 02 /
FURUKAWA, Tomoki c/o Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Materials Research Laboratories 11-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | 03 /
KOYAMA, Yoshinari c/o Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Materials Research Laboratories 11-1 Kitasode Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0266 / JP | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17774812.6 | 24.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017JP12159 | Priority number, date | JP20160073599 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016073599 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017170275 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438052 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01G23/04, C09C1/36, C09C3/12, C09D183/04, C09D201/00, C01G19/00, C01B33/00, C01G23/053 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
C01G23/053 (EP);
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
C01G19/00 (EP);
C01G23/04 (US);
C09C1/0081 (US);
C09C1/3661 (US);
C09C1/3684 (EP,US);
C09C3/006 (US);
C09C3/063 (US);
C09D135/02 (US);
C09D17/002 (US);
C09D17/007 (US);
C09D17/008 (US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/06 (US);
C09D201/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/006 (US);
C09D7/40 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
C01P2006/82 (EP);
C09C1/3045 (US);
C09C1/3054 (US);
C09C1/3081 (US);
C09C1/3653 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | C01G23/04, C09D7/12, C09D183/04, C09D201/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | ANORGANISCHE OXIDMIKROTEILCHEN MIT DARAN GEBUNDENER AMPHIPHILER ORGANISCHER SILANVERBINDUNG, ORGANISCHE LÖSUNGSMITTELDISPERSION DAFÜR UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE FILMBILDUNG | [2019/06] | English: | INORGANIC OXIDE MICROPARTICLES HAVING AMPHIPHILIC ORGANIC SILANE COMPOUND BONDED THERETO, ORGANIC SOLVENT DISPERSION THEREOF, AND COMPOSITION FOR FILM FORMATION | [2019/06] | French: | MICROPARTICULES D'OXYDE INORGANIQUE AYANT UN COMPOSÉ DE SILANE ORGANIQUE AMPHIPHILE LIÉ À CELLES-CI, DISPERSION DE SOLVANT ORGANIQUE DE CELLES-CI, ET COMPOSITION FILMOGÈNE | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2018 | Translation filed | 29.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 01.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1041404 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0048]; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2213623 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0018] , [0024]; claims 1,3,6,7,11 *; | [A]EP2308803 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033]; claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP2527293 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A]EP2724984 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0021] , [0032]; claim - * | International search | [Y]WO2011090084 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0004] to [0066]; claims & JP 5704345 B2 & US 2012/0316266 A1 paragraphs [0008] to [0163]; claims & EP 2527293 A1 & CN 102781821 A & KR 10-2012-0127461 A & TW 201138943 A *; | [Y]WO2012165620 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0126]; claims & US 2014/0199554 A1 paragraphs [0016] to [0187]; claims & EP 2724984 A1 & CN 103717535 A & KR 10-2014-0042830 A & TW 201313615 A *; | [Y]JP2014503446 (Pixelligent Technologies, LLC) [Y] 1-10* , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0003] to [0541]; fig. 1 to 27 & JP 2016-128374 A & JP 2013-534459 A & US 2012/0088845 A1 paragraphs [0003] to [0168]; claims; fig. 1 to 14 & US 8920675 B2 & US 8883903 B2 & US 2014/0295649 A1 & US 2014/0302664 A1 & US 2015/0203989 A1 & US 2016/0203981 A1 & US 2017/0044687 A1 & WO 2012/058271 A2 & WO 2011/133228 A2 & CN 103328374 A & CN 102947218 A & CN 105858600 A & CN 105931696 A & CN 105931697 A & KR 2013/0105291 A * | by applicant | JPS574345B | JPH03258866 | JPH11343349 | JP2003073564 | JP2004300312 | JP4273942B | WO2012165620 | JP2015182938 |